Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2829040

EP2829040 - COMMUNICATING SYSTEM, COMMUNICATING TERMINAL, COMMUNICATING METHOD AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.04.2019
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.05.2019  [2019/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2015/05]For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1 Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / IIHOSHI, Takahiro
c/o NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108 8001 / JP
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)Robson, Aidan John
Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building
10 Whitechapel High Street
London E1 8QS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/05]Robson, Aidan John
Reddie & Grose LLP
16 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date13765141.021.03.2013
WO2013JP01906
Priority number, dateJP2012006818923.03.2012         Original published format: JP 2012068189
[2015/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013140801
Date:26.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2829040
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013
[2015/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP26.09.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, H04L29/08, H04W12/06, H04W76/02
[2015/48]
Former International [2015/05]H04L29/06, H04L29/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
TitleGerman:KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM, KOMMUNIKATIONSENDGERÄT, KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND SPEICHERMEDIUM[2015/05]
English:COMMUNICATING SYSTEM, COMMUNICATING TERMINAL, COMMUNICATING METHOD AND STORAGE MEDIUM[2015/05]
French:SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION, TERMINAL DE COMMUNICATION, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION ET MOYEN DE STOCKAGE[2015/05]
Entry into regional phase23.09.2014National basic fee paid 
23.09.2014Search fee paid 
23.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
23.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
19.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.09.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.12.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/21]
16.01.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2019/21]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.11.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
10.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]US6751677  (ILNICKI SLAWOMIR K [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * column 8, line 28 - column 9, line 9; figures 3-5 * * column 9, line 34 - column 9, line 48; figure 7 *;
 [X]US2012066134  (WASHIRO TAKANORI [JP]) [X] 1-9 * paragraphs [0038] - [0061]; figures 1-3 *
International search[X]JP2003198568  (SONY CORP);
 [Y]JP2012060373  (ISB CORP);
 [A]JP2002073565  (NEC CORP)
by applicantJP2011229184
 US6751677
 US2012066314