Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2874686

EP2874686 - SYSTEM FOR IMPROVED COMPLIANCE IN RESPIRATORY THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/22]SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR IMPROVED COMPLIANCE IN RESPIRATORY THERAPY
[2019/18]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.08.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.04.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.10.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[2019/40]
Former [2015/22]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / KIRBY, Mark, Todd
c/o High Tech Campus Building 5
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
02 / WITT, Erik Kurt
c/o High Tech Campus Building 5
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
 [2015/22]
Representative(s)Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2019/40]Steffen, Thomas
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Former [2015/22]Steffen, Thomas
Philips International B.V.
Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date13765496.812.07.2013
[2019/40]
WO2013IB55767
Priority number, dateUS201261672951P18.07.2012         Original published format: US 201261672951 P
[2015/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014013411
Date:23.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2874686
Date:27.05.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2014
[2015/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2874686
Date:02.10.2019
Language:EN
[2019/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.01.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61M16/00
[2019/18]
Former International [2015/22]A61M16/00, A61M16/16, A61M16/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/22]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM FÜR VERBESSERTE COMPLIANCE IN DER ATEMTHERAPIE[2019/18]
English:SYSTEM FOR IMPROVED COMPLIANCE IN RESPIRATORY THERAPY[2019/18]
French:SYSTÈME POUR OBSERVANCE AMÉLIORÉE D'UNE THÉRAPIE RESPIRATOIRE[2019/18]
Former [2015/22]SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR VERBESSERTE COMPLIANCE IN DER ATEMTHERAPIE
Former [2015/22]SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR IMPROVED COMPLIANCE IN RESPIRATORY THERAPY
Former [2015/22]SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR OBSERVANCE AMÉLIORÉE D'UNE THÉRAPIE RESPIRATOIRE
Entry into regional phase18.02.2015National basic fee paid 
18.02.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
18.02.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.02.2015Examination requested  [2015/22]
18.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.09.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.08.2019Fee for grant paid
21.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.08.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.09.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
01.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
31.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
31.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2005077447  (RESMED LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1,2,11,12 * the whole document * [I] 3-5,13-15;
 [XI]US2009038616  (MULCAHY DAVID [AU], et al) [X] 1-4,11-14 * the whole document * [I] 5,15;
 [XI]US2009205662  (KWOK PHILIP RODNEY [AU], et al) [X] 1-4,11-14 * the whole document * [I] 5,15;
 [A]FR2889071  (WEINMANN GERATE FUR MEDIZIN GM [DE]) [A] 5,15 * figure 3 *;
 [A]WO2011048524  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-5,11-15 * the whole document *
ExaminationUS2008060647
 WO2008100859