EP2893415 - ESTIMATING REMAINING USE TIME OF MOBILE COMPUTING DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.12.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.01.2022 [2022/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2017/45] |
Former [2015/29] | For all designated states Google Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEKKELPAK, Zoltan 450 North Mathilda Avenue Apt. E/306 Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | 02 /
SIMONYI, Gyula Apt. 21 Cannon Place 1 Herbert Road D4 Dublin / IE | [2015/29] | Representative(s) | Hewett, Jonathan Michael Richard Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/29] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13765851.4 | 04.09.2013 | WO2013US58017 | Priority number, date | US201261699031P | 10.09.2012 Original published format: US 201261699031 P | US201213622617 | 19.09.2012 Original published format: US201213622617 | US201313944419 | 17.07.2013 Original published format: US201313944419 | [2015/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014039530 | Date: | 13.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2893415 | Date: | 15.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/32 | [2015/29] | CPC: |
G06F1/3212 (EP,US);
G06F1/3203 (EP,US);
G06F1/3206 (EP,US);
H04M1/72454 (EP,US);
H04W52/0277 (EP,US);
G01R31/382 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/29] | Title | German: | SCHÄTZUNG DER VERBLEIBENDEN BENUTZUNGSZEIT VON MOBILEN RECHNERVORRICHTUNGEN | [2015/29] | English: | ESTIMATING REMAINING USE TIME OF MOBILE COMPUTING DEVICES | [2015/29] | French: | ESTIMATION DU TEMPS D'UTILISATION RESTANT DE DISPOSITIFS INFORMATIQUES MOBILES | [2015/29] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/29] | 24.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/01] | 29.11.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.11.2021 | 30.11.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.03.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2006001402 (KIM NEIL Y [US], et al) [X] 1-30 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0079] *; | [XI]US2008201587 (LEE MICHAEL M [US]) [X] 1-5,10-15,20-25,30 * figures 1-8 * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0054] *[I] 6-9,16-19,26-29; | [XI]US2010151918 (ANNAMBHOTLA SRINIVAS [US], et al) [X] 1-5,10-15,20-25,30 * figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0072] * [I] 6-9,16-19,26-29; | [XI]US2011071780 (TARKOMA SASU [FI]) [X] 1-5,10-15,20-25,30 * figures 1-6b * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0030] * * claims 1-3 * [I] 6-9,16-19,26-29; | [XI]US2011080422 (LEE KANG [US], et al) [X] 1-5,10-15,20-25,30 * figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0034] * [I] 6-9,16-19,26-29 |