Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2895150

EP2895150 - METHODS FOR MAKING PHARMACEUTICAL SOLID DOSAGE FORMS OF SPRAY-DRIED DISPERSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  29.09.2017
Database last updated on 17.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip24.11.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bend Research, Inc.
64550 Research Road
Bend, OR 97701 / US
[2015/30]
Inventor(s)01 / EVERETT, Jason A.
3846 Ruette San Raphael
San Diego, CA 92130 / US
02 / WALD, Randy, J.
2442 Nw Hemmingway
Bend, OR 97701 / US
03 / KONAGURTHU, Sanjay
1900 Ne Curtis Drive
Bend, OR 97701 / US
 [2015/30]
Representative(s)De Clercq & Partners
Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a
9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE
[N/P]
Former [2015/30]Macchetta, Andrea , et al
Capsugel Belgium NV
Rijksweg 11
2880 Bornem / BE
Application number, filing date13765862.105.09.2013
WO2013US58173
Priority number, dateUS201261699674P11.09.2012         Original published format: US 201261699674 P
[2015/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014042945
Date:20.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2895150
Date:22.07.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2014
[2015/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/16, A61K9/20
[2015/30]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/30]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PHARMAZEUTISCHEN FESTEN DOSIERFORMEN VON SPRÜHGETROCKNETEN DISPERSIONEN[2015/30]
English:METHODS FOR MAKING PHARMACEUTICAL SOLID DOSAGE FORMS OF SPRAY-DRIED DISPERSIONS[2015/30]
French:PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION DE FORMES POSOLOGIQUES SOLIDES PHARMACEUTIQUES DE DISPERSION SÉCHÉES PAR PULVÉRISATION[2015/30]
Entry into regional phase19.03.2015National basic fee paid 
19.03.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
19.03.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/30]
28.09.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.04.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.09.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
11.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
10.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201907   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO2012009503  (DOKOU ELENI [US], et al) [Y] 1-44 * example 1 * * claim - *;
 [Y]WO2007109605  (VERTEX PHARMA [US], et al) [Y] 1-44 * figure 3; examples 1,2,4 *;
 [A]WO2012027247  (VERTEX PHARMA [US], et al) [A] 1-44 * paragraphs [0002] , [0012] * * paragraphs [0121] , [0124] , [0191] * * paragraph [0193] - paragraph [0195] * * paragraph [0312] - paragraph [0319] * * paragraph [0353] - paragraph [0369] * * claim - *;
 [A]WO0168092  (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al) [A] 1-44 * page 1, line 5 - line 24 * * page 2, line 5 - line 31 * * examples 19-21,36 * * claim - *