Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2898140

EP2898140 - METHODS FOR CONDITIONING PRETREATED BIOMASS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.04.2018
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.04.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.05.2018  [2018/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Abengoa Bioenergy New Technologies LLC
16150 Main Circle Drive
Suite 300
Chesterfield, MO 63017 / US
[2015/31]
Inventor(s)01 / NGUYEN, Quang A.
c/o ABENGOA BIOENERGY NEW TECHNOLOGIES LLC
16150 Main Circle Dive
Suite 300
Chesterfield, Missouri 63017 / US
02 / HOLMES, Leroy D.
c/o Abengoa Bioenergy New Technologies LLC
16150 Main Circle Drive
Suite 300
Chesterfield, Missouri 63017 / US
03 / SCHELERT, James F.
c/o ABENGOA BIOENERGY NEW TECHNOLOGIES LLC
16150 Main Circle Drive
Suite 300
Chesterfield, Missouri 63017 / US
04 / BORCHERS, Mark A.
c/o ABENGOA BIOENERGY NEW TECHNOLOGIES LLC
16150 Main Circle Drive
Suite 300
Chesterfield, Missouri 63017 / US
 [2015/31]
Representative(s)Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen
WP Thompson
138 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/31]Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen
WP Thompson
55 Drury Lane
London WC2B 5SQ / GB
Application number, filing date13765885.209.09.2013
WO2013US58747
Priority number, dateUS20121362552924.09.2012         Original published format: US201213625529
[2015/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014046895
Date:27.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2898140
Date:29.07.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2014
[2015/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:D21C7/08, D21C7/10, D21C11/00, D21C5/00
[2015/31]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/31]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR KONDITIONIERUNG EINER VORBEHANDELTEN BIOMASSE[2015/31]
English:METHODS FOR CONDITIONING PRETREATED BIOMASS[2015/31]
French:PROCÉDÉS DE CONDITIONNEMENT DE BIOMASSE PRÉTRAITÉE[2015/31]
Entry into regional phase13.03.2015National basic fee paid 
13.03.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
13.03.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/31]
06.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.11.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/20]
03.01.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/20]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.04.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
23.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201604   M06   Fee paid on   23.02.2017
30.09.201705   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[I]US2009221814  (PSCHORN THOMAS [CA] ET AL) [I] 1-3 * paragraphs [0038] - [0043]; figure 1; claims 1-28 *;
 [I]WO2010022511  (IOGEN ENERGY CORP [CA]; ANAND VIJAY KUMAR [CA]; ROWLAND STEPHEN A [CA]) [I] 1-3,16,21 * paragraphs [0083] , [0084] , [0104] , [0105] , [0112] , [0113]; figures 1-3; claims 1-44 *;
 [A]WO2011028554  (ABENGOA BIOENERGY NEW TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]; NGUYEN QUANG A [US]) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2011091044  (SRIYA INNOVATIONS INC [US]; KILAMBI SRINIVAS [US]; KADAM KIRAN L [US]) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2012016180  (PURDUE RESEARCH FOUNDATION [US]; LADISCH MICHAEL R [US]; MOSIER NATHAN) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2011007369  (CHEMTEX ITALIA S R L [IT]; BONANNI ANDREA [IT]; CORBELLANI PAOLO [IT]) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4237226  (GRETHLEIN HANS E) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *