Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2898091

EP2898091 - METHODS FOR PREDICTING MULTIPLE MYELOMA TREATMENT RESPONSE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.08.2019
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale (INSERM)
101, rue de Tolbiac
75013 Paris / FR
For all designated states
Université de Montpellier I
5 Boulevard Henri VI, CS 19044
34967 Montpellier Cedex 2 / FR
For all designated states
Centre Hospitalier Universitaire de Montpellier
191, Avenue Doyen Gaston Giraud
34295 Montpellier Cedex 05 / FR
[2019/40]
Former [2015/31]For all designated states
Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale (INSERM)
101, rue de Tolbiac
75013 Paris / FR
For all designated states
Université de Montpellier I
5 Boulevard Henri VI, CS 19044
34967 Montpellier Cedex 2 / FR
For all designated states
Centre Hospitalier Universitaire de Montpellier
191, Avenue Doyen Gaston Giraud
34295 Montpellier Cedex 05 / FR
Inventor(s)01 / MOREAUX, Jérôme
Inserm U1040/Institut de Recherche en Biothérapie
Hôpital Saint-Eloi
CHU de Montpellier
80 Avenue Augustin Fliche
F-34295 Montpellier Cedex 5 / FR
02 / KLEIN, Bernard
Inserm U1040/Institut de Recherche en Biothérapie
Hôpital Saint-Eloi
CHU de Montpellier
80 Avenue Augustin Fliche
F-34295 Montpellier Cedex 5 / FR
 [2015/31]
Representative(s)Monni, Richard
Cabinet LLR
11 boulevard de Sébastopol
75001 Paris / FR
[2019/40]
Former [2015/31]Hirsch, Denise Marie
Inserm Transfert IP Department 7 rue Watt
75013 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date13766076.723.09.2013
[2019/40]
WO2013EP69736
Priority number, dateEP2012030614121.09.2012         Original published format: EP 12306141
[2015/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014044848
Date:27.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2898091
Date:29.07.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2014
[2015/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2898091
Date:02.10.2019
Language:EN
[2019/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/6886, A61K31/7068
[2019/19]
Former International [2015/31]C12Q1/68, A61K31/7068
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/31]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR VORHERSAGE DER BEHANDLUNGSREAKTION VON MULTIPLEM MYELOM[2019/19]
English:METHODS FOR PREDICTING MULTIPLE MYELOMA TREATMENT RESPONSE[2015/31]
French:PROCÉDÉS POUR PRÉDIRE UNE RÉPONSE DE TRAITEMENT D'UN MYÉLOME MULTIPLE[2019/19]
Former [2015/31]VERFAHREN ZUR VORHERSAGE DER BEHANDLUNGSREAKTION AUF DAS MULTIPLE MYELOM
Former [2015/31]PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉDICTION DE LA RÉPONSE AU TRAITEMENT DU MYÉLOME MULTIPLE
Entry into regional phase31.03.2015National basic fee paid 
31.03.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
31.03.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/31]
23.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.08.2019Fee for grant paid
20.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.08.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.06.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
02.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
30.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
22.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[YD]  - J. MOREAUX ET AL, "A high-risk signature for patients with multiple myeloma established from the molecular classification of human myeloma cell lines", HAEMATOLOGICA, (20101220), vol. 96, no. 4, doi:10.3324/haematol.2010.033456, ISSN 0390-6078, pages 574 - 582, XP055050703 [YD] 1 * pages 575,580; table S8 * * page 578 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.3324/haematol.2010.033456
    [ ] - J. Moreaux ET AL, "A high-risk signature for patients with multiple myeloma established from the molecular classification of human myeloma cell lines- supplementary appendix", Haematologica, doi:10.3324/haematol.2010.033456, (20101220), pages 1 - 14, URL: http://www.haematologica.org/content/suppl/2011/04/01/haematol.2010.033456.DC2/033456.Moreaux_suppl.pdf, (20130129), XP055051624

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.3324/haematol.2010.033456
 [XY]  - K. Vanderkerken ET AL, "EPIGENETIC CHANGES OF MYELOMA CELLS WITHIN THE BONE MARROW MICROENVIRONMENT", Haematologica: Abstract Book 13th International Myeloma Workshop, Paris, France, May 3-6, 2011, vol. 96, no. supplement 1, ISSN 0390-6078, (20110501), pages s8 - s9, URL: http://www.haematologica.org/content/96/supplement_1/S1.full.pdf+html, (20130130), XP055051689 [X] 2 * abstract * [Y] 1
 [XY]  - G. HELLER ET AL, "Genome-Wide Transcriptional Response to 5-Aza-2'-Deoxycytidine and Trichostatin A in Multiple Myeloma Cells", CANCER RESEARCH, (20080101), vol. 68, no. 1, doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-07-2531, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 44 - 54, XP055051386 [X] 2 * abstract * * page 44 * * page 53 * [Y] 1

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-07-2531
 [X]  - EMMA M. SMITH ET AL, "The potential role of epigenetic therapy in multiple myeloma", BRITISH JOURNAL OF HAEMATOLOGY, (20100301), vol. 148, no. 5, doi:10.1111/j.1365-2141.2009.07976.x, ISSN 0007-1048, pages 702 - 713, XP055051410 [X] 2 * pages 706,708 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2141.2009.07976.x
 [A]  - M. NOJIMA ET AL, "Genomic Screening for Genes Silenced by DNA Methylation Revealed an Association between RASD1 Inactivation and Dexamethasone Resistance in Multiple Myeloma", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, (20090701), vol. 15, no. 13, doi:10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-08-3336, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 4356 - 4364, XP055050720 [A] 1,2 * page 4362 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-08-3336
by applicant   - HOHEISEL, NATURE REVIEWS, GENETICS, (2006), vol. 7, pages 200 - 210
    - HAHN WC; WEINBERG RA, "Rules for making human tumor cells", N ENGL J MED., (2002), vol. 347, no. 20, pages 1593 - 1603
    - VOGELSTEIN B; KINZLER KW, "Cancer genes and the pathways they control", NAT MED., (2004), vol. 10, no. 8, doi:doi:10.1038/nm1087, pages 789 - 799, XP002552463

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm1087
    - BAYLIN SB, "DNA methylation and gene silencing in cancer", NAT CLIN PRACT ONCOL., (2005), vol. 2, pages S4 - 11
    - KONDO Y., "Epigenetic cross-talk between DNA methylation and histone modifications in human cancers", YONSEI MED J., (2009), vol. 50, no. 4, pages 455 - 463
    - ISSA JP, "DNA methylation as a therapeutic target in cancer", CLIN CANCER RES., (2007), vol. 13, no. 6, pages 1634 - 1637
    - ISSA JP; GARCIA-MANERO G; GILES FJ ET AL., "Phase 1 study of low-dose prolonged exposure schedules of the hypomethylating agent 5-aza-2'-deoxycytidine (decitabine) in hematopoietic malignancies", BLOOD, (2004), vol. 103, no. 5, pages 1635 - 1640
    - OKI Y; JELINEK J; SHEN L; KANTARJIAN HM; ISSA JP, "Induction of hypomethylation and molecular response after decitabine therapy in patients with chronic myelomonocytic leukemia", BLOOD, (2008), vol. 111, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1182/blood-2007-07-103960, pages 2382 - 2384, XP055023088

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2007-07-103960
    - BERGSAGEL PL; KUEHL WM, "Molecular pathogenesis and a consequent classification of multiple myeloma", J CLIN ONCOL., (2005), vol. 23, no. 26, pages 6333 - 6338, XP009136724
    - HIDESHIMA T; BERGSAGEL PL; KUEHL WM; ANDERSON KC, "Advances in biology of multiple myeloma: clinical applications", BLOOD, (2004), vol. 104, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1182/blood-2004-01-0037, pages 607 - 618, XP002579403

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2004-01-0037
    - CHEN G; WANG Y; HUANG H ET AL., "Combination of DNA methylation inhibitor 5-azacytidine and arsenic trioxide has synergistic activity in myeloma", EUR J HAEMATOL., (2009), vol. 82, no. 3, pages 176 - 183
    - DE CARVALHO F; COLLEONI GW; ALMEIDA MS; CARVALHO AL; VETTORE AL, "TGFbetaR2 aberrant methylation is a potential prognostic marker and therapeutic target in multiple myeloma", INT J CANCER, (2009), vol. 125, no. 8, pages 1985 - 1991
    - GALM 0; YOSHIKAWA H; ESTELLER M; OSIEKA R; HERMAN JG, "SOCS-1, a negative regulator of cytokine signaling, is frequently silenced by methylation in multiple myeloma", BLOOD, (2003), vol. 101, no. 7, pages 2784 - 2788
    - HATZIMICHAEL E; DRANITSARIS G; DASOULA A ET AL., "Von Hippel-Lindau methylation status in patients with multiple myeloma: a potential predictive factor for the development of bone disease", CLIN LYMPHOMA MYELOMA., (2009), vol. 9, no. 3, pages 239 - 242
    - HODGE DR; PENG B; CHERRY JC ET AL., "Interleukin 6 supports the maintenance of p53 tumor suppressor gene promoter methylation", CANCER RES., (2005), vol. 65, no. 11, pages 4673 - 4682
    - NG MH; CHUNG YF; LO KW; WICKHAM NW; LEE JC; HUANG DP, "Frequent hypermethylation ofp16 and p15 genes in multiple myeloma", BLOOD, (1997), vol. 89, no. 7, pages 2500 - 2506
    - SEIDL S; ACKERMANN J; KAUFMANN H ET AL., "DNA-methylation analysis identifies the E-cadherin gene as a potential marker of disease progression in patients with monoclonal gammopathies", CANCER, (2004), vol. 100, no. 12, pages 2598 - 2606
    - TSHUIKINA M; JERNBERG-WIKLUND H; NILSSON K; OBERG F, "Epigenetic silencing of the interferon regulatory factor ICSBP/IRF8 in human multiple myeloma", EXP HEMATOL., (2008), vol. 36, no. 12, doi:doi:10.1016/j.exphem.2008.08.001, pages 1673 - 1681, XP025656105

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.exphem.2008.08.001
    - HELLER G; SCHMIDT WM; ZIEGLER B ET AL., "Genome-wide transcriptional response to 5-aza-2'-deoxycytidine and trichostatin a in multiple myeloma cells", CANCER RES., (2008), vol. 68, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-07-2531, pages 44 - 54, XP055051386

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-07-2531
    - WILOP S; VAN GEMMEREN TB; LENTJES MH ET AL., "Methylation-associated dysregulation of the suppressor of cytokine signaling-3 gene in multiple myeloma", EPIGENETICS, (2011), vol. 6, no. 8, pages 1047 - 1052
    - MOREAUX J; KLEIN B; BATAILLE R ET AL., "A high-risk signature for patients with multiple myeloma established from the molecular classification of human myeloma cell lines", HAEMATOLOGICA, (2011), vol. 96, no. 4, doi:doi:10.3324/haematol.2010.033456, pages 574 - 582, XP055050703

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.3324/haematol.2010.033456
    - ZHANG XG; GAILLARD JP; ROBILLARD N ET AL., "Reproducible obtaining of human myeloma cell lines as a model for tumor stem cell study in human multiple myeloma", BLOOD, (1994), vol. 83, no. 12, pages 3654 - 3663
    - REBOUISSOU C; WIJDENES J; AUTISSIER P ET AL., "A gp130 interleukin-6 transducer- dependent SCID model of human multiple myeloma", BLOOD, (1998), vol. 91, no. 12, pages 4727 - 4737
    - TARTE K; ZHANG XG; LEGOUFFE E ET AL., "Induced expression of B7-1 on myeloma cells following retroviral gene transfer results in tumor-specific recognition by cytotoxic T cells", J IMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 163, no. 1, pages 514 - 524
    - GU ZJ; VOS JD; REBOUISSOU C ET AL., "Agonist anti-gp130 transducer monoclonal antibodies are human myeloma cell survival and growth factors", LEUKEMIA, (2000), vol. 14, no. 1, pages 188 - 197
    - GOLDSCHMIDT H; SONNEVELD P; CREMER FW ET AL., "Joint HOVON-50/GMMG- HD3 randomized trial on the effect of thalidomide as part of a high-dose therapy regimen and as maintenance treatment for newly diagnosed myeloma patients", ANN HEMATOL., (2003), vol. 82, no. 10, pages 654 - 659
    - CREMER FW; BILA J; BUCK I ET AL., "Delineation of distinct subgroups of multiple myeloma and a model for clonal evolution based on interphase cytogenetics", GENES CHROMOSOMES CANCER., (2005), vol. 44, no. 2, pages 194 - 203, XP002472759
    - BARLOGIE B; TRICOT G; RASMUSSEN E ET AL., "Total therapy 2 without thalidomide in comparison with total therapy 1: role of intensified induction and posttransplantation consolidation therapies", BLOOD, (2006), vol. 107, no. 7, pages 2633 - 2638
    - SPRYNSKI AC; HOSE D; CAILLOT L ET AL., "The role of IGF-I as a major growth factor for myeloma cell lines and the prognostic relevance of the expression of its receptor", BLOOD, (2009), vol. 113, no. 19, doi:doi:10.1182/blood-2008-07-170464, pages 4614 - 4626, XP002760090

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2008-07-170464
    - XIONG W; WU X; STARNES S ET AL., "An analysis of the clinical and biologic significance of TP53 loss and the identification of potential novel transcriptional targets of TP53 in multiple myeloma", BLOOD, (2008), vol. 112, no. 10, doi:doi:10.1182/blood-2007-10-119123, pages 4235 - 4246, XP055133235

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2007-10-119123
    - MOREAUX J; LEGOUFFE E; JOURDAN E ET AL., "BAFF and APRIL protect myeloma cells from apoptosis induced by interleukin 6 deprivation and dexamethasone", BLOOD, (2004), vol. 103, no. 8, doi:doi:10.1182/blood-2003-06-1984, pages 3148 - 3157, XP055275026

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2003-06-1984
    - HOSE D; REME T; MEISSNER T ET AL., "Inhibition of aurora kinases for tailored risk-adapted treatment of multiple myeloma", BLOOD, (2009), vol. 113, no. 18, pages 4331 - 4340
    - MOREAUX J; CREMER FW; REME T ET AL., "The level ofTACI gene expression in myeloma cells is associated with a signature of microenvironment dependence versus a plasmablastic signature", BLOOD, (2005), vol. 106, no. 3, pages 1021 - 1030
    - REME T; HOSE D; DE VOS J ET AL., "A new method for class prediction based on signed-rank algorithms applied to Affymetrix microarray experiments", BMC BIOINFORMATICS, (2008), vol. 9, page 16, XP021031728
    - TANGUY LE CARROUR SA; SYLVIE TONDEUR; LUDOVIC LHERMITTE; NED LAMB; THIERRY REME; VERONIQUE PANTESCO; SAMIR HAMAMAH; BERNARD KLEIN;, "Amazonia!: An Online Resource to Google and Visualize Public Human whole Genome Expression Data", THE OPEN BIOINFORMATICS JOURNAL, (2010), vol. 4, pages 5 - 10
    - CUI X; CHURCHILL GA, "Statistical tests for differential expression in cDNA microarray experiments", GENOME BIOL., (2003), vol. 4, no. 4, page 210
    - ZHAN F; HUANG Y; COLLA S ET AL., "The molecular classification of multiple myeloma", BLOOD, (2006), vol. 108, no. 6, pages 2020 - 2028
    - CHU WK; HICKSON ID, "RecQ helicases: multifunctional genome caretakers", NAT REV CANCER, (2009), vol. 9, no. 9, pages 644 - 654
    - HARRIGAN JA; BOHR VA, "Human diseases deficient in RecQ helicases", BIOCHIMIE, (2003), vol. 85, no. 11, pages 1185 - 1193
    - HICKSON ID, "RecQ helicases: caretakers of the genome", NAT REV CANCER, (2003), vol. 3, no. 3, pages 169 - 178
    - ARAI A; CHANO T; FUTAMI K ET AL., "RECQL1 and WRN proteins are potential therapeutic targets in head and neck squamous cell carcinoma", CANCER RES., (2011), vol. 71, no. 13, doi:doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-11-0320, pages 4598 - 4607, XP055362405

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-11-0320
    - FUTAMI K; KUMAGAI E; MAKINO H ET AL., "Induction of mitotic cell death in cancer cells by small interference RNA suppressing the expression of RecQLl helicase", CANCER SCI., (2008), vol. 99, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1111/j.1349-7006.2007.00647.x, pages 71 - 80, XP002577312

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1349-7006.2007.00647.x
    - FUTAMI K; KUMAGAI E; MAKINO H ET AL., "Anticancer activity of RecQLl helicase siRNA in mouse xenograft models", CANCER SCI., (2008), vol. 99, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1111/j.1349-7006.2008.00794.x, pages 1227 - 1236, XP002577313

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1349-7006.2008.00794.x
    - MENDOZA-MALDONADO R; FAORO V; BAJPAI S ET AL., "The human RECQ helicase is highly expressed in glioblastoma and plays an important role in tumor cell proliferation", MOL CANCER., (2011), vol. 10, doi:doi:10.1186/1476-4598-10-83, page 83, XP021105473

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1476-4598-10-83
    - MIKI H; OKADA Y; HIROKAWA N, "Analysis of the kinesin superfamily: insights into structure and function", TRENDS CELL BIOL., (2005), vol. 15, no. 9, doi:doi:10.1016/j.tcb.2005.07.006, pages 467 - 476, XP005058815

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tcb.2005.07.006
    - HIROKAWA N, "Kinesin and dynein superfamily proteins and the mechanism of organelle transport", SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 279, no. 5350, doi:doi:10.1126/science.279.5350.519, pages 519 - 526, XP002906891

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.279.5350.519
    - YU Y; FENG YM, "The role of kinesin family proteins in tumorigenesis and progression: potential biomarkers and molecular targets for cancer therapy", CANCER, (2010), vol. 116, no. 22, pages 5150 - 5160
    - ZHU C; ZHAO J; BIBIKOVA M ET AL., "Functional analysis of human microtubule- based motor proteins, the kinesins and dyneins, in mitosis/cytokinesis using RNA interference", MOL BIOL CELL, (2005), vol. 16, no. 7, pages 3187 - 3199
    - AVET-LOISEAU H; LI C; MAGRANGEAS F ET AL., "Prognostic significance of copy- number alterations in multiple myeloma", J CLIN ONCOL., (2009), vol. 27, no. 27, pages 4585 - 4590
    - AGNELLI L; FORCATO M; FERRARI F ET AL., "The reconstruction of transcriptional networks reveals critical genes with implications for clinical outcome of multiple myeloma", CLIN CANCER RES., (2011), vol. 17, no. 23, pages 7402 - 7412
    - DE VOS, J.; THYKJAER, T.; TARTE, K.; ENSSLEN, M.; RAYNAUD, P.; REQUIRAND, G.; PELLET, F.; PANTESCO, V.; REME, T.; JOURDAN, M., "Comparison of gene expression profiling between malignant and normal plasma cells with oligonucleotide arrays", ONCOGENE, (2002), vol. 21, pages 6848 - 6857
    - FLOTHO, C.; CLAUS, R.; BATZ, C.; SCHNEIDER, M.; SANDROCK, I.; IHDE, S.; PLASS, C.; NIEMEYER, C.M.; LUBBERT, M., "The DNA methyltransferase inhibitors azacitidine, decitabine and zebularine exert differential effects on cancer gene expression in acute myeloid leukemia cells", LEUKEMIA, (2009), vol. 23, doi:doi:10.1038/leu.2008.397, pages 1019 - 1028, XP055338982

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/leu.2008.397
    - GHOSHAL, K.; DATTA, J.; MAJUMDER, S.; BAI, S.; KUTAY, H.; MOTIWALA, T.; JACOB, S.T., "5-Aza-deoxycytidine induces selective degradation of DNA methyltransferase 1 by a proteasomal pathway that requires the KEN box, bromo-adjacent homology domain, and nuclear localization signal", MOL CELL BIOL, (2005), vol. 25, doi:doi:10.1128/MCB.25.11.4727-4741.2005, pages 4727 - 4741, XP055153499

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/MCB.25.11.4727-4741.2005
    - HEUCK, C.J.; MEHTA, J.; BHAGAT, T.; GUNDABOLU, K.; YU, Y.; KHAN, S.; CHRYSOFAKIS, G.; SCHINKE, C.; TARIMAN, J.; VICKREY, E., "Myeloma is characterized by stage-specific alterations in DNA methylation that occur early during myelomagenesis", J IMMUNOL, (2013), vol. 190, pages 2966 - 2975
    - HOLLENBACH, P.W.; NGUYEN, A.N.; BRADY, H.; WILLIAMS, M.; NING, Y.; RICHARD, N.; KRUSHEL, L.; AUKERMAN, S.L.; HEISE, C.; MACBETH, K, "A comparison of azacitidine and decitabine activities in acute myeloid leukemia cell lines", PLOS ONE, (2010), vol. 5, page E9001
    - JOURDAN, M.; FERLIN, M.; LEGOUFFE, E.; HORVATHOVA, M.; LIAUTARD, J.; ROSSI, J.F.; WIJDENES, J.; BROCHIER, J.; KLEIN, B., "The myeloma cell antigen syndecan-1 is lost by apoptotic myeloma cells", BR J HAEMATOL, (1998), vol. 100, pages 637 - 646
    - KIZILTEPE, T.; HIDESHIMA, T.; CATLEY, L.; RAJE, N.; YASUI, H.; SHIRAISHI, N.; OKAWA, Y.; IKEDA, H.; VALLET, S.; POZZI, S., "5-Azacytidine, a DNA methyltransferase inhibitor, induces ATR- mediated DNA double-strand break responses, apoptosis, and synergistic cytotoxicity with doxorubicin and bortezomib against multiple myeloma cells", MOL CANCER THER, (2007), vol. 6, pages 1718 - 1727
    - MAES, K.; MENU, E.; VAN VALCKENBORGH, E.; VAN RIET, I.; VANDERKERKEN, K.; DE BRUYNE, E., "Epigenetic Modulating Agents as a New Therapeutic Approach in Multiple Myeloma", CANCERS, (2013), vol. 5, pages 430 - 461
    - MAHTOUK, K.; JOURDAN, M.; DE VOS, J.; HERTOGH, C.; FIOL, G.; JOURDAN, E.; ROSSI, J.F.; KLEIN, B., "An inhibitor of the EGF receptor family blocks myeloma cell growth factor activity of HB-EGF and potentiates dexamethasone or anti-IL-6 antibody-induced apoptosis", BLOOD, (2004), vol. 103, pages 1829 - 1837
    - MOREAUX, J.; REME, T.; LEONARD, W.; VEYRUNE, J.L.; REQUIRAND, G.; GOLDSCHMIDT, H.; HOSE, D.; KLEIN, B., "Development of gene expression-based score to predict sensitivity of multiple myeloma cells to DNA methylation inhibitors", MOL CANCER THER, (2012), vol. 11, doi:doi:10.1158/1535-7163.MCT-12-0721, pages 2685 - 2692, XP055050719

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1535-7163.MCT-12-0721
    - PALII, S.S.; VAN EMBURGH, B.O.; SANKPAL, U.T.; BROWN, K.D.; ROBERTSON, K.D., "DNA methylation inhibitor 5-Aza-2'-deoxycytidine induces reversible genome- wide DNA damage that is distinctly influenced by DNA methyltransferases 1 and 3B", MOL CELL BIOL, (2008), vol. 28, doi:doi:10.1128/MCB.01799-07, pages 752 - 771, XP055067587

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/MCB.01799-07
    - RODRIGUEZ-PAREDES, M.; ESTELLER, M., "Cancer epigenetics reaches mainstream oncology", NAT MED, (2011), vol. 17, pages 330 - 339
    - STRESEMANN, C.; BRUECKNER, B.; MUSCH, T.; STOPPER, H.; LYKO, F., "Functional diversity of DNA methyltransferase inhibitors in human cancer cell lines", CANCER RES, (2006), vol. 66, doi:doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-05-2821, pages 2794 - 2800, XP002491322

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-05-2821
    - TANGUY LE CARROUR, S.A.; SYLVIE TONDEUR; LUDOVIC LHERMITTE; NED LAMB; THIERRY REME; VERONIQUE PANTESCO; SAMIR HAMAMAH; BERNARD KLE, "Amazonia!: An Online Resource to Google and Visualize Public Human whole Genome Expression Data", THE OPEN BIOINFORMATICS JOURNAL, (2010), vol. 4, pages 5 - 10
    - TOOR, A.A.; PAYNE, K.K.; CHUNG, H.M.; SABO, R.T.; HAZLETT, A.F.; KMIECIAK, M.; SANFORD, K.; WILLIAMS, D.C.; CLARK, W.B.; ROBERTS,, "Epigenetic induction of adaptive immune response in multiple myeloma: sequential azacitidine and lenalidomide generate cancer testis antigen-specific cellular immunity", BR J HAEMATOL, (2012), vol. 158, pages 700 - 711
    - ZHANG, X.G.; GAILLARD, J.P.; ROBILLARD, N.; LU, Z.Y.; GU, Z.J.; JOURDAN, M.; BOIRON, J.M.; BATAILLE, R.; KLEIN, B., "Reproducible obtaining of human myeloma cell lines as a model for tumor stem cell study in human multiple myeloma", BLOOD, (1994), vol. 83, pages 3654 - 3663