Extract from the Register of European Patents

Citations: EP2898091

Cited inInternational search
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:[YD]  - J. MOREAUX ET AL, "A high-risk signature for patients with multiple myeloma established from the molecular classification of human myeloma cell lines", HAEMATOLOGICA, (20101220), vol. 96, no. 4, doi:10.3324/haematol.2010.033456, ISSN 0390-6078, pages 574 - 582, XP055050703 [YD] 1 * pages 575,580; table S8 * * page 578 *
DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3324/haematol.2010.033456
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   [ ] - J. Moreaux ET AL, "A high-risk signature for patients with multiple myeloma established from the molecular classification of human myeloma cell lines- supplementary appendix", Haematologica, doi:10.3324/haematol.2010.033456, (20101220), pages 1 - 14, URL: http://www.haematologica.org/content/suppl/2011/04/01/haematol.2010.033456.DC2/033456.Moreaux_suppl.pdf, (20130129), XP055051624
DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3324/haematol.2010.033456
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:[XY]  - K. Vanderkerken ET AL, "EPIGENETIC CHANGES OF MYELOMA CELLS WITHIN THE BONE MARROW MICROENVIRONMENT", Haematologica: Abstract Book 13th International Myeloma Workshop, Paris, France, May 3-6, 2011, vol. 96, no. supplement 1, ISSN 0390-6078, (20110501), pages s8 - s9, URL: http://www.haematologica.org/content/96/supplement_1/S1.full.pdf+html, (20130130), XP055051689 [X] 2 * abstract * [Y] 1
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:[XY]  - G. HELLER ET AL, "Genome-Wide Transcriptional Response to 5-Aza-2'-Deoxycytidine and Trichostatin A in Multiple Myeloma Cells", CANCER RESEARCH, (20080101), vol. 68, no. 1, doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-07-2531, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 44 - 54, XP055051386 [X] 2 * abstract * * page 44 * * page 53 * [Y] 1
DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-07-2531
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:[X]  - EMMA M. SMITH ET AL, "The potential role of epigenetic therapy in multiple myeloma", BRITISH JOURNAL OF HAEMATOLOGY, (20100301), vol. 148, no. 5, doi:10.1111/j.1365-2141.2009.07976.x, ISSN 0007-1048, pages 702 - 713, XP055051410 [X] 2 * pages 706,708 *
DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2141.2009.07976.x
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:[A]  - M. NOJIMA ET AL, "Genomic Screening for Genes Silenced by DNA Methylation Revealed an Association between RASD1 Inactivation and Dexamethasone Resistance in Multiple Myeloma", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, (20090701), vol. 15, no. 13, doi:10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-08-3336, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 4356 - 4364, XP055050720 [A] 1,2 * page 4362 *
DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-08-3336
Cited inby applicant
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - HOHEISEL, NATURE REVIEWS, GENETICS, (2006), vol. 7, pages 200 - 210
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - HAHN WC; WEINBERG RA, "Rules for making human tumor cells", N ENGL J MED., (2002), vol. 347, no. 20, pages 1593 - 1603
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - VOGELSTEIN B; KINZLER KW, "Cancer genes and the pathways they control", NAT MED., (2004), vol. 10, no. 8, doi:doi:10.1038/nm1087, pages 789 - 799, XP002552463
DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm1087
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - BAYLIN SB, "DNA methylation and gene silencing in cancer", NAT CLIN PRACT ONCOL., (2005), vol. 2, pages S4 - 11
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - KONDO Y., "Epigenetic cross-talk between DNA methylation and histone modifications in human cancers", YONSEI MED J., (2009), vol. 50, no. 4, pages 455 - 463
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - ISSA JP, "DNA methylation as a therapeutic target in cancer", CLIN CANCER RES., (2007), vol. 13, no. 6, pages 1634 - 1637
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - ISSA JP; GARCIA-MANERO G; GILES FJ ET AL., "Phase 1 study of low-dose prolonged exposure schedules of the hypomethylating agent 5-aza-2'-deoxycytidine (decitabine) in hematopoietic malignancies", BLOOD, (2004), vol. 103, no. 5, pages 1635 - 1640
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - OKI Y; JELINEK J; SHEN L; KANTARJIAN HM; ISSA JP, "Induction of hypomethylation and molecular response after decitabine therapy in patients with chronic myelomonocytic leukemia", BLOOD, (2008), vol. 111, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1182/blood-2007-07-103960, pages 2382 - 2384, XP055023088
DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2007-07-103960
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - BERGSAGEL PL; KUEHL WM, "Molecular pathogenesis and a consequent classification of multiple myeloma", J CLIN ONCOL., (2005), vol. 23, no. 26, pages 6333 - 6338, XP009136724
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - HIDESHIMA T; BERGSAGEL PL; KUEHL WM; ANDERSON KC, "Advances in biology of multiple myeloma: clinical applications", BLOOD, (2004), vol. 104, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1182/blood-2004-01-0037, pages 607 - 618, XP002579403
DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2004-01-0037
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - CHEN G; WANG Y; HUANG H ET AL., "Combination of DNA methylation inhibitor 5-azacytidine and arsenic trioxide has synergistic activity in myeloma", EUR J HAEMATOL., (2009), vol. 82, no. 3, pages 176 - 183
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - DE CARVALHO F; COLLEONI GW; ALMEIDA MS; CARVALHO AL; VETTORE AL, "TGFbetaR2 aberrant methylation is a potential prognostic marker and therapeutic target in multiple myeloma", INT J CANCER, (2009), vol. 125, no. 8, pages 1985 - 1991
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - GALM 0; YOSHIKAWA H; ESTELLER M; OSIEKA R; HERMAN JG, "SOCS-1, a negative regulator of cytokine signaling, is frequently silenced by methylation in multiple myeloma", BLOOD, (2003), vol. 101, no. 7, pages 2784 - 2788
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - HATZIMICHAEL E; DRANITSARIS G; DASOULA A ET AL., "Von Hippel-Lindau methylation status in patients with multiple myeloma: a potential predictive factor for the development of bone disease", CLIN LYMPHOMA MYELOMA., (2009), vol. 9, no. 3, pages 239 - 242
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - HODGE DR; PENG B; CHERRY JC ET AL., "Interleukin 6 supports the maintenance of p53 tumor suppressor gene promoter methylation", CANCER RES., (2005), vol. 65, no. 11, pages 4673 - 4682
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - NG MH; CHUNG YF; LO KW; WICKHAM NW; LEE JC; HUANG DP, "Frequent hypermethylation ofp16 and p15 genes in multiple myeloma", BLOOD, (1997), vol. 89, no. 7, pages 2500 - 2506
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - SEIDL S; ACKERMANN J; KAUFMANN H ET AL., "DNA-methylation analysis identifies the E-cadherin gene as a potential marker of disease progression in patients with monoclonal gammopathies", CANCER, (2004), vol. 100, no. 12, pages 2598 - 2606
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - TSHUIKINA M; JERNBERG-WIKLUND H; NILSSON K; OBERG F, "Epigenetic silencing of the interferon regulatory factor ICSBP/IRF8 in human multiple myeloma", EXP HEMATOL., (2008), vol. 36, no. 12, doi:doi:10.1016/j.exphem.2008.08.001, pages 1673 - 1681, XP025656105
DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.exphem.2008.08.001
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - HELLER G; SCHMIDT WM; ZIEGLER B ET AL., "Genome-wide transcriptional response to 5-aza-2'-deoxycytidine and trichostatin a in multiple myeloma cells", CANCER RES., (2008), vol. 68, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-07-2531, pages 44 - 54, XP055051386
DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-07-2531
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - WILOP S; VAN GEMMEREN TB; LENTJES MH ET AL., "Methylation-associated dysregulation of the suppressor of cytokine signaling-3 gene in multiple myeloma", EPIGENETICS, (2011), vol. 6, no. 8, pages 1047 - 1052
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - MOREAUX J; KLEIN B; BATAILLE R ET AL., "A high-risk signature for patients with multiple myeloma established from the molecular classification of human myeloma cell lines", HAEMATOLOGICA, (2011), vol. 96, no. 4, doi:doi:10.3324/haematol.2010.033456, pages 574 - 582, XP055050703
DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3324/haematol.2010.033456
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - ZHANG XG; GAILLARD JP; ROBILLARD N ET AL., "Reproducible obtaining of human myeloma cell lines as a model for tumor stem cell study in human multiple myeloma", BLOOD, (1994), vol. 83, no. 12, pages 3654 - 3663
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - REBOUISSOU C; WIJDENES J; AUTISSIER P ET AL., "A gp130 interleukin-6 transducer- dependent SCID model of human multiple myeloma", BLOOD, (1998), vol. 91, no. 12, pages 4727 - 4737
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - TARTE K; ZHANG XG; LEGOUFFE E ET AL., "Induced expression of B7-1 on myeloma cells following retroviral gene transfer results in tumor-specific recognition by cytotoxic T cells", J IMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 163, no. 1, pages 514 - 524
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - GU ZJ; VOS JD; REBOUISSOU C ET AL., "Agonist anti-gp130 transducer monoclonal antibodies are human myeloma cell survival and growth factors", LEUKEMIA, (2000), vol. 14, no. 1, pages 188 - 197
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - GOLDSCHMIDT H; SONNEVELD P; CREMER FW ET AL., "Joint HOVON-50/GMMG- HD3 randomized trial on the effect of thalidomide as part of a high-dose therapy regimen and as maintenance treatment for newly diagnosed myeloma patients", ANN HEMATOL., (2003), vol. 82, no. 10, pages 654 - 659
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - CREMER FW; BILA J; BUCK I ET AL., "Delineation of distinct subgroups of multiple myeloma and a model for clonal evolution based on interphase cytogenetics", GENES CHROMOSOMES CANCER., (2005), vol. 44, no. 2, pages 194 - 203, XP002472759
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - BARLOGIE B; TRICOT G; RASMUSSEN E ET AL., "Total therapy 2 without thalidomide in comparison with total therapy 1: role of intensified induction and posttransplantation consolidation therapies", BLOOD, (2006), vol. 107, no. 7, pages 2633 - 2638
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - SPRYNSKI AC; HOSE D; CAILLOT L ET AL., "The role of IGF-I as a major growth factor for myeloma cell lines and the prognostic relevance of the expression of its receptor", BLOOD, (2009), vol. 113, no. 19, doi:doi:10.1182/blood-2008-07-170464, pages 4614 - 4626, XP002760090
DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2008-07-170464
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - XIONG W; WU X; STARNES S ET AL., "An analysis of the clinical and biologic significance of TP53 loss and the identification of potential novel transcriptional targets of TP53 in multiple myeloma", BLOOD, (2008), vol. 112, no. 10, doi:doi:10.1182/blood-2007-10-119123, pages 4235 - 4246, XP055133235
DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2007-10-119123
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - MOREAUX J; LEGOUFFE E; JOURDAN E ET AL., "BAFF and APRIL protect myeloma cells from apoptosis induced by interleukin 6 deprivation and dexamethasone", BLOOD, (2004), vol. 103, no. 8, doi:doi:10.1182/blood-2003-06-1984, pages 3148 - 3157, XP055275026
DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2003-06-1984
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - HOSE D; REME T; MEISSNER T ET AL., "Inhibition of aurora kinases for tailored risk-adapted treatment of multiple myeloma", BLOOD, (2009), vol. 113, no. 18, pages 4331 - 4340
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - MOREAUX J; CREMER FW; REME T ET AL., "The level ofTACI gene expression in myeloma cells is associated with a signature of microenvironment dependence versus a plasmablastic signature", BLOOD, (2005), vol. 106, no. 3, pages 1021 - 1030
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - REME T; HOSE D; DE VOS J ET AL., "A new method for class prediction based on signed-rank algorithms applied to Affymetrix microarray experiments", BMC BIOINFORMATICS, (2008), vol. 9, page 16, XP021031728
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - TANGUY LE CARROUR SA; SYLVIE TONDEUR; LUDOVIC LHERMITTE; NED LAMB; THIERRY REME; VERONIQUE PANTESCO; SAMIR HAMAMAH; BERNARD KLEIN;, "Amazonia!: An Online Resource to Google and Visualize Public Human whole Genome Expression Data", THE OPEN BIOINFORMATICS JOURNAL, (2010), vol. 4, pages 5 - 10
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - CUI X; CHURCHILL GA, "Statistical tests for differential expression in cDNA microarray experiments", GENOME BIOL., (2003), vol. 4, no. 4, page 210
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - ZHAN F; HUANG Y; COLLA S ET AL., "The molecular classification of multiple myeloma", BLOOD, (2006), vol. 108, no. 6, pages 2020 - 2028
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - CHU WK; HICKSON ID, "RecQ helicases: multifunctional genome caretakers", NAT REV CANCER, (2009), vol. 9, no. 9, pages 644 - 654
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - HARRIGAN JA; BOHR VA, "Human diseases deficient in RecQ helicases", BIOCHIMIE, (2003), vol. 85, no. 11, pages 1185 - 1193
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - HICKSON ID, "RecQ helicases: caretakers of the genome", NAT REV CANCER, (2003), vol. 3, no. 3, pages 169 - 178
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - ARAI A; CHANO T; FUTAMI K ET AL., "RECQL1 and WRN proteins are potential therapeutic targets in head and neck squamous cell carcinoma", CANCER RES., (2011), vol. 71, no. 13, doi:doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-11-0320, pages 4598 - 4607, XP055362405
DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-11-0320
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - FUTAMI K; KUMAGAI E; MAKINO H ET AL., "Induction of mitotic cell death in cancer cells by small interference RNA suppressing the expression of RecQLl helicase", CANCER SCI., (2008), vol. 99, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1111/j.1349-7006.2007.00647.x, pages 71 - 80, XP002577312
DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1349-7006.2007.00647.x
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - FUTAMI K; KUMAGAI E; MAKINO H ET AL., "Anticancer activity of RecQLl helicase siRNA in mouse xenograft models", CANCER SCI., (2008), vol. 99, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1111/j.1349-7006.2008.00794.x, pages 1227 - 1236, XP002577313
DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1349-7006.2008.00794.x
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - MENDOZA-MALDONADO R; FAORO V; BAJPAI S ET AL., "The human RECQ helicase is highly expressed in glioblastoma and plays an important role in tumor cell proliferation", MOL CANCER., (2011), vol. 10, doi:doi:10.1186/1476-4598-10-83, page 83, XP021105473
DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1476-4598-10-83
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - MIKI H; OKADA Y; HIROKAWA N, "Analysis of the kinesin superfamily: insights into structure and function", TRENDS CELL BIOL., (2005), vol. 15, no. 9, doi:doi:10.1016/j.tcb.2005.07.006, pages 467 - 476, XP005058815
DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tcb.2005.07.006
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - HIROKAWA N, "Kinesin and dynein superfamily proteins and the mechanism of organelle transport", SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 279, no. 5350, doi:doi:10.1126/science.279.5350.519, pages 519 - 526, XP002906891
DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.279.5350.519
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - YU Y; FENG YM, "The role of kinesin family proteins in tumorigenesis and progression: potential biomarkers and molecular targets for cancer therapy", CANCER, (2010), vol. 116, no. 22, pages 5150 - 5160
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - ZHU C; ZHAO J; BIBIKOVA M ET AL., "Functional analysis of human microtubule- based motor proteins, the kinesins and dyneins, in mitosis/cytokinesis using RNA interference", MOL BIOL CELL, (2005), vol. 16, no. 7, pages 3187 - 3199
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - AVET-LOISEAU H; LI C; MAGRANGEAS F ET AL., "Prognostic significance of copy- number alterations in multiple myeloma", J CLIN ONCOL., (2009), vol. 27, no. 27, pages 4585 - 4590
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - AGNELLI L; FORCATO M; FERRARI F ET AL., "The reconstruction of transcriptional networks reveals critical genes with implications for clinical outcome of multiple myeloma", CLIN CANCER RES., (2011), vol. 17, no. 23, pages 7402 - 7412
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - DE VOS, J.; THYKJAER, T.; TARTE, K.; ENSSLEN, M.; RAYNAUD, P.; REQUIRAND, G.; PELLET, F.; PANTESCO, V.; REME, T.; JOURDAN, M., "Comparison of gene expression profiling between malignant and normal plasma cells with oligonucleotide arrays", ONCOGENE, (2002), vol. 21, pages 6848 - 6857
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - FLOTHO, C.; CLAUS, R.; BATZ, C.; SCHNEIDER, M.; SANDROCK, I.; IHDE, S.; PLASS, C.; NIEMEYER, C.M.; LUBBERT, M., "The DNA methyltransferase inhibitors azacitidine, decitabine and zebularine exert differential effects on cancer gene expression in acute myeloid leukemia cells", LEUKEMIA, (2009), vol. 23, doi:doi:10.1038/leu.2008.397, pages 1019 - 1028, XP055338982
DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/leu.2008.397
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - GHOSHAL, K.; DATTA, J.; MAJUMDER, S.; BAI, S.; KUTAY, H.; MOTIWALA, T.; JACOB, S.T., "5-Aza-deoxycytidine induces selective degradation of DNA methyltransferase 1 by a proteasomal pathway that requires the KEN box, bromo-adjacent homology domain, and nuclear localization signal", MOL CELL BIOL, (2005), vol. 25, doi:doi:10.1128/MCB.25.11.4727-4741.2005, pages 4727 - 4741, XP055153499
DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/MCB.25.11.4727-4741.2005
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - HEUCK, C.J.; MEHTA, J.; BHAGAT, T.; GUNDABOLU, K.; YU, Y.; KHAN, S.; CHRYSOFAKIS, G.; SCHINKE, C.; TARIMAN, J.; VICKREY, E., "Myeloma is characterized by stage-specific alterations in DNA methylation that occur early during myelomagenesis", J IMMUNOL, (2013), vol. 190, pages 2966 - 2975
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - HOLLENBACH, P.W.; NGUYEN, A.N.; BRADY, H.; WILLIAMS, M.; NING, Y.; RICHARD, N.; KRUSHEL, L.; AUKERMAN, S.L.; HEISE, C.; MACBETH, K, "A comparison of azacitidine and decitabine activities in acute myeloid leukemia cell lines", PLOS ONE, (2010), vol. 5, page E9001
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - JOURDAN, M.; FERLIN, M.; LEGOUFFE, E.; HORVATHOVA, M.; LIAUTARD, J.; ROSSI, J.F.; WIJDENES, J.; BROCHIER, J.; KLEIN, B., "The myeloma cell antigen syndecan-1 is lost by apoptotic myeloma cells", BR J HAEMATOL, (1998), vol. 100, pages 637 - 646
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - KIZILTEPE, T.; HIDESHIMA, T.; CATLEY, L.; RAJE, N.; YASUI, H.; SHIRAISHI, N.; OKAWA, Y.; IKEDA, H.; VALLET, S.; POZZI, S., "5-Azacytidine, a DNA methyltransferase inhibitor, induces ATR- mediated DNA double-strand break responses, apoptosis, and synergistic cytotoxicity with doxorubicin and bortezomib against multiple myeloma cells", MOL CANCER THER, (2007), vol. 6, pages 1718 - 1727
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - MAES, K.; MENU, E.; VAN VALCKENBORGH, E.; VAN RIET, I.; VANDERKERKEN, K.; DE BRUYNE, E., "Epigenetic Modulating Agents as a New Therapeutic Approach in Multiple Myeloma", CANCERS, (2013), vol. 5, pages 430 - 461
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - MAHTOUK, K.; JOURDAN, M.; DE VOS, J.; HERTOGH, C.; FIOL, G.; JOURDAN, E.; ROSSI, J.F.; KLEIN, B., "An inhibitor of the EGF receptor family blocks myeloma cell growth factor activity of HB-EGF and potentiates dexamethasone or anti-IL-6 antibody-induced apoptosis", BLOOD, (2004), vol. 103, pages 1829 - 1837
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - MOREAUX, J.; REME, T.; LEONARD, W.; VEYRUNE, J.L.; REQUIRAND, G.; GOLDSCHMIDT, H.; HOSE, D.; KLEIN, B., "Development of gene expression-based score to predict sensitivity of multiple myeloma cells to DNA methylation inhibitors", MOL CANCER THER, (2012), vol. 11, doi:doi:10.1158/1535-7163.MCT-12-0721, pages 2685 - 2692, XP055050719
DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1535-7163.MCT-12-0721
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - PALII, S.S.; VAN EMBURGH, B.O.; SANKPAL, U.T.; BROWN, K.D.; ROBERTSON, K.D., "DNA methylation inhibitor 5-Aza-2'-deoxycytidine induces reversible genome- wide DNA damage that is distinctly influenced by DNA methyltransferases 1 and 3B", MOL CELL BIOL, (2008), vol. 28, doi:doi:10.1128/MCB.01799-07, pages 752 - 771, XP055067587
DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/MCB.01799-07
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - RODRIGUEZ-PAREDES, M.; ESTELLER, M., "Cancer epigenetics reaches mainstream oncology", NAT MED, (2011), vol. 17, pages 330 - 339
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - STRESEMANN, C.; BRUECKNER, B.; MUSCH, T.; STOPPER, H.; LYKO, F., "Functional diversity of DNA methyltransferase inhibitors in human cancer cell lines", CANCER RES, (2006), vol. 66, doi:doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-05-2821, pages 2794 - 2800, XP002491322
DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-05-2821
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - TANGUY LE CARROUR, S.A.; SYLVIE TONDEUR; LUDOVIC LHERMITTE; NED LAMB; THIERRY REME; VERONIQUE PANTESCO; SAMIR HAMAMAH; BERNARD KLE, "Amazonia!: An Online Resource to Google and Visualize Public Human whole Genome Expression Data", THE OPEN BIOINFORMATICS JOURNAL, (2010), vol. 4, pages 5 - 10
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - TOOR, A.A.; PAYNE, K.K.; CHUNG, H.M.; SABO, R.T.; HAZLETT, A.F.; KMIECIAK, M.; SANFORD, K.; WILLIAMS, D.C.; CLARK, W.B.; ROBERTS,, "Epigenetic induction of adaptive immune response in multiple myeloma: sequential azacitidine and lenalidomide generate cancer testis antigen-specific cellular immunity", BR J HAEMATOL, (2012), vol. 158, pages 700 - 711
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - ZHANG, X.G.; GAILLARD, J.P.; ROBILLARD, N.; LU, Z.Y.; GU, Z.J.; JOURDAN, M.; BOIRON, J.M.; BATAILLE, R.; KLEIN, B., "Reproducible obtaining of human myeloma cell lines as a model for tumor stem cell study in human multiple myeloma", BLOOD, (1994), vol. 83, pages 3654 - 3663