Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2898091 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2898091



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 542
14.10.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
05.09.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
29.08.2019 Communication regarding the forthcoming grant Search / examination 2
20.08.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.08.2019 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
20.08.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
20.08.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
20.08.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
22.05.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
22.05.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
22.05.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
22.05.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 67
22.05.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 67
28.06.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
28.06.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
28.06.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
28.06.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
28.06.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
28.06.2018 Claims Search / examination 2
28.06.2018 Claims Search / examination 2
28.06.2018 Claims Search / examination 2
28.06.2018 Claims Search / examination 2
28.06.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
28.06.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
08.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.03.2018 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
08.03.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.03.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
01.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
01.03.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.03.2018 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
27.02.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
27.02.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
12.06.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
12.06.2017 Citation for the examination procedure Search / examination 2
12.06.2017 Claims Search / examination 2
12.06.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.06.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 7
12.06.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
02.03.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
02.03.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
19.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.10.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
19.10.2016 Claims Search / examination 1
19.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.10.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
23.06.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
23.06.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
13.06.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
27.05.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
20.05.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
13.05.2016 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 3
02.11.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
27.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.10.2015 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
27.10.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.10.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
01.10.2015 Invitation to file an authorisation Search / examination 1
17.09.2015 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
14.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.09.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
01.07.2015 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
29.04.2015 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
24.04.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.04.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
21.04.2015 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 8
08.04.2015 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
31.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
31.03.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
31.03.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
31.03.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
31.03.2015 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
30.01.2015 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
14.04.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 57
27.03.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
27.03.2014 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 67
16.10.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
16.10.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
16.10.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 4
23.09.2013 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
23.09.2013 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
23.09.2013 Claims PCT receiving Office 1
23.09.2013 Description PCT receiving Office 58
23.09.2013 Drawings PCT receiving Office 7
23.09.2013 Priority document (RO-procedure) PCT receiving Office 56