Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2898091


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
30.08.2019 (Expected) grant published on  02.10.2019  [2019/40]
26.08.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.08.2019 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
23.08.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
23.08.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
21.05.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
05.04.2019 Change - classification published on  08.05.2019  [2019/19]
05.04.2019 Change - classification published on  08.05.2019  [2019/19]
05.04.2019 Change - German title published on  08.05.2019  [2019/19]
05.04.2019 Change - French title published on  08.05.2019  [2019/19]
03.09.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.06.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
09.03.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.03.2018 Change - representative
06.10.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.06.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
13.03.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
24.10.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
05.10.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.07.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
24.06.2016 First examination report
23.05.2016 Change - representative
27.11.2015 Change - extension states published on  30.12.2015  [2015/53]
29.10.2015 Change - representative
06.10.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.06.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  29.07.2015  [2015/31]
26.06.2015 Request for examination filed published on  29.07.2015  [2015/31]
25.04.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
05.04.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
02.04.2015 Amendment by applicant
01.04.2015 Change - representative
01.04.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
10.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
28.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
12.10.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
02.10.2013 PCT data prior to European publication