Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2904546

EP2904546 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR AMBIENT LIGHTING COLOR DETERMINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.06.2018
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 18.12.2019  [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[2017/30]
Former [2015/33]For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
Inventor(s)01 / FLEUREAU, Julien
22 rue Emile Bernard
F-35000 Rennes / FR
02 / BERNON, Jeremie
1 rue des Graviers
F-92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR
03 / DANIEAU, Fabien
4 square du Docteur Guérin
F-35000 Rennes / FR
04 / GUILLOTEL, Philippe
15 rue Auguste Renoir
F-92443 Verme sur Seiche / FR
 [2015/33]
Representative(s)Huchet, Anne , et al
TECHNICOLOR
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[2017/30]
Former [2015/33]Schmidt-Uhlig, Thomas
Deutsche Thomson OHG
European Patent Operations
Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74
30625 Hannover / DE
Application number, filing date13766376.126.09.2013
[2015/33]
WO2013EP70094
Priority number, dateEP2012030621004.10.2012         Original published format: EP 12306210
[2015/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014053391
Date:10.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2904546
Date:12.08.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2014
[2015/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2904546
Date:26.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.04.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06K9/46, H05B37/02
[2015/33]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/33]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER FARBE VON UMGEBUNGSLICHT[2015/33]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR AMBIENT LIGHTING COLOR DETERMINATION[2015/33]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE DÉTERMINATION DE COULEUR D'ÉCLAIRAGE AMBIANT[2015/33]
Entry into regional phase26.03.2015National basic fee paid 
26.03.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
26.03.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/33]
04.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.06.2017Fee for grant paid
13.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.06.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.04.2016
Opposition(s)30.04.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
23.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU26.09.2013
AT26.07.2017
CY26.07.2017
CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
EE26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
IT26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
MC26.07.2017
MK26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RO26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
SI26.07.2017
SK26.07.2017
SM26.07.2017
IE26.09.2017
LU26.09.2017
MT26.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
BG26.10.2017
GB26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
[2019/51]
Former [2019/47]HU26.09.2013
AT26.07.2017
CY26.07.2017
CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
EE26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
IT26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
MC26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RO26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
SI26.07.2017
SK26.07.2017
SM26.07.2017
IE26.09.2017
LU26.09.2017
MT26.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
BG26.10.2017
GB26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2019/31]HU26.09.2013
AT26.07.2017
CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
EE26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
IT26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
MC26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RO26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
SI26.07.2017
SK26.07.2017
SM26.07.2017
IE26.09.2017
LU26.09.2017
MT26.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
BG26.10.2017
GB26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2018/43]AT26.07.2017
CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
EE26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
IT26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
MC26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RO26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
SI26.07.2017
SK26.07.2017
SM26.07.2017
IE26.09.2017
LU26.09.2017
MT26.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
BG26.10.2017
GB26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2018/37]AT26.07.2017
CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
EE26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
IT26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
MC26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RO26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
SI26.07.2017
SK26.07.2017
SM26.07.2017
IE26.09.2017
LU26.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
BG26.10.2017
GB26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2018/36]AT26.07.2017
CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
EE26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
IT26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
MC26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RO26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
SK26.07.2017
SM26.07.2017
IE26.09.2017
LU26.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
BG26.10.2017
GB26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2018/35]AT26.07.2017
CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
EE26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
IT26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
MC26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RO26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
SK26.07.2017
SM26.07.2017
IE26.09.2017
LU26.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
BG26.10.2017
GB26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2018/34]AT26.07.2017
CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
EE26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
IT26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
MC26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RO26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
SK26.07.2017
SM26.07.2017
IE26.09.2017
LU26.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2018/30]AT26.07.2017
CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
EE26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
IT26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
MC26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RO26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
SK26.07.2017
SM26.07.2017
LU26.09.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2018/26]AT26.07.2017
CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
EE26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
IT26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
MC26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RO26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
SK26.07.2017
SM26.07.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2018/25]AT26.07.2017
CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
EE26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
IT26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RO26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
SK26.07.2017
SM26.07.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2018/21]AT26.07.2017
CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2018/12]AT26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2018/11]AT26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2018/10]AT26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
NO26.10.2017
Former [2018/09]FI26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
NO26.10.2017
Former [2018/08]FI26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
NO26.10.2017
Former [2018/07]LT26.07.2017
NO26.10.2017
Cited inInternational search[XYI]WO2010061334  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,2,5-8,11,12 * abstract * * page 4 - page 8 * [Y] 5,11 [I] 3,4,9,10;
 [YDA]US2007242162  (GUTTA SRINIVAS [IN], et al) [YD] 5,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0160] - paragraph [0189] * [A] 1-4,6-10,12;
 [A]US2009175555  (MAHOWALD PETER H [US]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0068] *;
 [A]US2009059589  (HUANG LING-HSIU [TW], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 1 - page 2 *;
 [A]US6611297  (AKASHI YUKIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [AD]  - MEUR LE O ET AL, "A coherent computational approach to model bottom-up visual attention", TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, USA, (20060501), vol. 28, no. 5, doi:10.1109/TPAMI.2006.86, ISSN 0162-8828, pages 802 - 817, XP001520793 [AD] 1-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TPAMI.2006.86
Examination   - YUN ZHANG ET AL, "Stereoscopic Visual Attention-Based Regional Bit Allocation Optimization for Multiview Video Coding", EURASIP JOURNAL ON ADVANCES IN SIGNAL PROCESSING, HINDAWI PUBLISHING CORP, US, (20100629), vol. 2010, doi:10.1155/2010/848713, ISSN 1687-6172, pages 848713 - 1, XP002687175

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1155/2010/848713
    - YUN ZHANG ET AL, Stereoscopic Visual Attention Model for 3D Video, ADVANCES IN MULTIMEDIA MODELING, SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 314 - 324, (20100106), ISBN 978-3-642-11300-0, XP019137864
    - ZAHEER AZIZ M ET AL, "Pre-attentive detection of depth saliency using stereo vision", APPLIED IMAGERY PATTERN RECOGNITION WORKSHOP (AIPR), 2010 IEEE 39TH, IEEE, (20101013), doi:10.1109/AIPR.2010.5759692, ISBN 978-1-4244-8833-9, pages 1 - 7, XP031861097

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/AIPR.2010.5759692
by applicantUS2007242162
    - 0. LE MEUR ET AL., "A coherent computational approach to model the bottom-up visual attention", IEEE TRANS. PATTERN. ANAL. MACH. INTELL., vol. 28, pages 802 - 817