EP2907024 - SOLUTION FOR DISTRIBUTED APPLICATION LIFE-CYCLE MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.03.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 01.05.2019 [2019/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/34] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DE POEL, Dirk Zwaluwenlaan 42 F-2630 Aartselaar / FR | 02 /
GOEMAERE, Patrick Kemphaanlaan 26 B-2960 Brecht / BE | 03 /
JONCKHEER, Kurt Hessenstraatje 10 bus 43 B-2000 Antwerpen / BE | [2015/34] | Representative(s) | Vidon Brevets & Stratégie 16B, rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/34] | Schmidt-Uhlig, Thomas Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 13767015.4 | 30.09.2013 | [2015/34] | WO2013EP70364 | Priority number, date | EP20120306242 | 11.10.2012 Original published format: EP 12306242 | [2015/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014056750 | Date: | 17.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2907024 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/445 | [2015/34] | CPC: |
G06F8/61 (EP,US);
G06F8/70 (US);
G06F16/9535 (US);
G06F8/65 (US);
H04L67/10 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/34] | Title | German: | LÖSUNG ZUR LEBENSZYKLUSVERWALTUNG EINER VERTEILTEN ANWENDUNG | [2015/34] | English: | SOLUTION FOR DISTRIBUTED APPLICATION LIFE-CYCLE MANAGEMENT | [2015/34] | French: | SOLUTION POUR GESTION DE CYCLE DE VIE D'APPLICATION DISTRIBUÉE | [2015/34] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/34] | 26.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.12.2018 | 10.12.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 12.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/18] | 22.12.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.02.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1724682 (NOVELL INC [US]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0030]; figure 6 * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0034]; figures 7A,7B * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036]; figure 8 ** paragraph [0026] *; | [A]WO2009109980 (ONMOBILE GLOBAL LTD [IN], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * page 2, line 22 - page 3, line 2 *; | [YD]EP2184904 (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR]) [YD] 2,3,9,10 * claims 1-6 *; | [A]US2011202915 (KUROYANAGI TOMOHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * figure 4 *; | [XYI]WO2012056324 (FRANCE TELECOM [FR], et al) [X] 1,4,6-8,11,13,14 * abstract * * page 2, line 28 - page 3, line 2 * * page 5, line 15 - page 9, line 18; figure 1 * [Y] 2,3,9,10 [I] 5,12; | [A]US2012123898 (KIRKEBY KEVIN W [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | Examination | US2004060045 | US2005097543 | WO2011064675 | by applicant | EP2184904 |