Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2892580

EP2892580 - IRRIGATION/ASPIRATION SYSTEM, CARTRIDGE, PUMP UNIT, SURGICAL MACHINE, METHOD FOR CONTROLLING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.08.2017
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
D.O.R.C. Dutch Ophthalmic Research Center (International) B.V.
Scheijdelveweg 2
3214 VN Zuidland / NL
[2015/29]
Inventor(s)01 / KUNTZ, John Peter
c/o Scheijdelveweg 2
NL-3214 VN Zuidland / NL
02 / VIJFVINKEL, Gerrit Jan
c/o Scheijdelveweg 2
NL-3214 VN Zuidland / NL
 [2015/29]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2016/41]
Former [2015/29]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date13767140.006.09.2013
[2016/41]
WO2013NL50645
Priority number, dateNL2012200942406.09.2012         Original published format: NL 2009424
[2015/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014038941
Date:13.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2892580
Date:15.07.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2014
[2015/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2892580
Date:12.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61M1/00
[2015/29]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/29]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SPÜL- UND ABSAUGUNGSSYSTEM, KARTUSCHE, PUMPENEINHEIT, CHIRURGISCHE MASCHINE UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG[2015/29]
English:IRRIGATION/ASPIRATION SYSTEM, CARTRIDGE, PUMP UNIT, SURGICAL MACHINE, METHOD FOR CONTROLLING[2015/29]
French:SYSTÈME D'IRRIGATION/ASPIRATION, CARTOUCHE, UNITÉ DE POMPE, MACHINE CHIRURGICALE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE[2015/29]
Entry into regional phase31.03.2015National basic fee paid 
31.03.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
31.03.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/29]
30.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.01.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
26.01.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.03.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.07.2016Fee for grant paid
28.07.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.07.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.01.2016
Opposition(s)13.07.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
01.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.09.2013
CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
MC12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SI12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
SM12.10.2016
BG12.01.2017
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/29]CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
MC12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SI12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
SM12.10.2016
BG12.01.2017
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
Former [2017/52]CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SI12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
SM12.10.2016
BG12.01.2017
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
Former [2017/38]CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
SM12.10.2016
BG12.01.2017
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
Former [2017/36]CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
Former [2017/34]CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
Former [2017/33]DK12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
Former [2017/26]FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
Former [2017/12]LV12.10.2016
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2004059284  (NASH JOHN E [US], et al) [X] 1,3,23 * page 3, paragraph 38 - page 4, column 1, line 3 * * page 4, line 18, paragraph 40 - line 20, paragraph 40 * * page 4 * * sentence 37, paragraph 40 - sentence 39, paragraph 40 * * page 4, paragraph 46 - page 5, paragraph 46 * * figures 1-3,4A-4C,5A,5B.6A,-6B * [I] 4,5;
 [X]US2007112297  (PLAHEY KULWINDER S [US], et al) [X] 11,13-17,19-21 * page 4, paragraph 47 - paragraph 49 * * page 5, paragraph 59 - paragraph 62 * * page 6, paragraph 75 - page 7, paragraph 75 * * figures 1,2,4,11,12 *;
 [XAI]WO2011063794  (GEUDER AG [DE], et al) [X] 17,19,22 * page 3, paragraph 4 - page 4, paragraph 1 * * page 5, paragraph 4 - page 6, paragraph 1 * * page 5, paragraph 6 - page 7, paragraph l * * figure 1 * [A] 23 [I] 11,13-16,20,21;
 [A]WO2010129128  (ALCON RES LTD [US], et al) [A] 1,11,17,23 * page 5, line 11 - page 8, line 5 * * page 10, line 3 - page 11, line 10 * * page 14, line 21 - page 15, line 7 * * figures 1a-1d,2a,2b,3a-3d,4a,4b,5a-5c,6,7 *
by applicantEP1900347