Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2907255 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2907255



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 459
15.07.2019 Closing of application Search / examination 1
03.04.2019 Application deemed to be withdrawn ( translations of claims/payment missing from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
12.10.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
12.10.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
12.10.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
12.10.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 38
12.10.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 38
19.09.2016 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
25.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
25.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
25.04.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 4
25.04.2016 Claims Search / examination 4
25.04.2016 Description Search / examination 3
25.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.04.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
04.03.2016 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
29.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.02.2016 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.10.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
21.10.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
15.10.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
29.07.2015 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.07.2015 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
13.07.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
13.07.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
18.05.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.05.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
21.04.2015 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
21.04.2015 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 8
10.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
10.04.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
10.04.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
10.04.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
10.04.2015 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
20.02.2015 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
20.01.2015 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 9
20.01.2015 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
20.01.2015 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
20.01.2015 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
20.01.2015 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
06.11.2014 Annex PCT Chapter 2 procedure 9
06.11.2014 Fax filed during the PCT2 procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
06.11.2014 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
06.11.2014 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
06.11.2014 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
16.09.2014 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
16.09.2014 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
16.09.2014 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
07.05.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 46
07.05.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 55
23.04.2014 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
17.04.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
17.04.2014 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 40
26.03.2014 Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
26.03.2014 Notification of defects in correspondence PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
26.03.2014 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
26.03.2014 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
26.03.2014 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
26.03.2014 Reply to International Search Opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
26.03.2014 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/404 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
17.03.2014 Invitation to correct defects in demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
17.03.2014 Notification of defects in correspondence PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
13.03.2014 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
10.03.2014 Invitation to correct defects in demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
06.03.2014 Cover sheet for fax transmission PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
06.03.2014 Document concerning fees and payments PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
06.03.2014 Letter concerning fees and payments PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
06.03.2014 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
06.03.2014 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
06.03.2014 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
06.03.2014 Reply to International Search Opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
09.12.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
09.12.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
09.12.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 6
23.09.2013 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
23.09.2013 Claims International Searching Authority 5
23.09.2013 Description International Searching Authority 27
23.09.2013 Drawings International Searching Authority 7