Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2907255

EP2907255 - APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR MANAGING HYPER FRAME NUMBER (HFN) DE-SYNCHRONIZATION IN RADIO LINK CONTROL (RLC) UNACKNOWLEDGED MODE (UM) [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.07.2019
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.07.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.08.2019  [2019/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2015/34]
Inventor(s)01 / KANAMARLAPUDI, Sitaramanjaneyulu
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
02 / HSU, Liangchi
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
 [2015/34]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/34]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date13767188.912.09.2013
[2015/34]
WO2013US59429
Priority number, dateUS201261712120P10.10.2012         Original published format: US 201261712120 P
US20131402415611.09.2013         Original published format: US201314024156
[2015/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014058560
Date:17.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2907255
Date:19.08.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2014
[2015/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.04.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04L1/18
[2015/34]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/34]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWALTUNG EINER HYPER-FRAME-NUMMERN (HFN)-DESYNCHRONISIERUNG IN EINER FUNKVERBINDUNGSSTEUERUNG MIT UNBESTÄTIGTEM MODUS[2015/34]
English:APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR MANAGING HYPER FRAME NUMBER (HFN) DE-SYNCHRONIZATION IN RADIO LINK CONTROL (RLC) UNACKNOWLEDGED MODE (UM)[2015/34]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉS DE GESTION DE DÉSYNCHRONISATION DE NOMBRE D'HYPERTRAMES (HFN) EN MODE SANS ACCUSÉ DE RÉCEPTION (UM) DE CONTRÔLE DE LIAISON RADIO (RLC)[2015/34]
Entry into regional phase10.04.2015National basic fee paid 
10.04.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
10.04.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.03.2014Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/34]
21.10.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.04.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.02.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/34]
03.04.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2019/34]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.10.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
08.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
11.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XI]EP2075942  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-7,10-18 * column 2, paragraph 6 - column 4, paragraph 19 * * column 8, paragraph 40 - paragraph 41 * * column 9, paragraph 46 - column 10, paragraph 51 * [I] 8,19;
 [A]US2003147370  (WU CHIH-HSIANG [TW]) [A] 1,10-12 * page 1, column r, paragraph 10 - page 2, column l, paragraph 11 * * page 2, column l, paragraph 15 * * page 2, column r, paragraph 27 - page 3, column l, paragraph 30 *;
 [A]  - JIANG S S ET AL, "AUTOMATIC RECOVERY OF CIPHERING PARAMETER SYNCHRONIZATION", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, COMMUNICATIONS SOCIETY, TOKYO, JP, (20051001), vol. E88-B, no. 10, doi:10.1093/IETCOM/E88-B.10.4008, ISSN 0916-8516, pages 4008 - 4012, XP001234397 [A] 1,10-12 * page 4008, column l, paragraph 1 - column r, paragraph 1 * * page 4009, column l, paragraph 2.1 * * page 410, column r, paragraph 3.1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/ietcom/e88-b.10.4008