Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2832998

EP2832998 - PUMP DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2017
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.12.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ulvac Kiko, Inc.
291-7 Oaza Chausubaru
Saito-shi, Miyazaki 881-0037 / JP
[2015/06]
Inventor(s)01 / OSAKA, Taisuke
c/o ULVAC KIKO INC.
291-7 Oaza Chausubaru
Saito-shi, Miyazaki 881-0037 / JP
02 / TANABE, Yusaku
c/o ULVAC KIKO INC.
291-7 Oaza Chausubaru
Saito-shi, Miyazaki 881-0037 / JP
03 / CHOUNO, Motoyasu
c/o ULVAC KIKO INC.
291-7 Oaza Chausubaru
Saito-shi, Miyazaki 881-0037 / JP
04 / ITOYAMA, Ryuji
c/o ULVAC KIKO INC.
291-7 Oaza Chausubaru
Saito-shi, Miyazaki 881-0037 / JP
 [2017/03]
Former [2015/06]01 / OSAKA, Taisuke
c/o ULVAC KIKO INC.
291-7 Oaza Chausubaru
Saito-shi Miyazaki 881-0037 / JP
02 / TANABE, Yusaku
c/o ULVAC KIKO INC.
291-7 Oaza Chausubaru
Saito-shi Miyazaki 881-0037 / JP
03 / CHOUNO, Motoyasu
c/o ULVAC KIKO INC.
291-7 Oaza Chausubaru
Saito-shi Miyazaki 881-0037 / JP
04 / ITOYAMA, Ryuji
c/o ULVAC KIKO INC.
291-7 Oaza Chausubaru
Saito-shi Miyazaki 881-0037 / JP
Representative(s)Markfort, Iris-Anne Lucie
Lorenz & Kollegen
Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Alte Ulmer Straße 2
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2015/06]
Application number, filing date13768264.707.03.2013
[2017/03]
WO2013JP01436
Priority number, dateJP2012008201530.03.2012         Original published format: JP 2012082015
[2015/06]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013145576
Date:03.10.2013
Language:JA
[2013/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2832998
Date:04.02.2015
Language:EN
[2015/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2832998
Date:18.01.2017
Language:EN
[2017/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP03.10.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:F04B27/00, F04B41/06, F04B35/04, F04B39/00
[2016/03]
Former International [2015/06]F04B41/06, F04B27/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/06]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:PUMPVORRICHTUNG[2015/06]
English:PUMP DEVICE[2015/06]
French:DISPOSITIF DE POMPE[2015/06]
Entry into regional phase16.09.2014Translation filed 
16.09.2014National basic fee paid 
16.09.2014Search fee paid 
16.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
16.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/06]
19.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.09.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.12.2016Fee for grant paid
07.12.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.12.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.09.2016
Opposition(s)19.10.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU07.03.2013
AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
IE07.03.2017
LU07.03.2017
MT07.03.2017
BE31.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
FR31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
BG18.04.2017
GB18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/43]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
IE07.03.2017
LU07.03.2017
MT07.03.2017
BE31.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
FR31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
BG18.04.2017
GB18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2018/24]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
IE07.03.2017
LU07.03.2017
BE31.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
FR31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
BG18.04.2017
GB18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2018/13]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SI18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
IE07.03.2017
LU07.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
FR31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
BG18.04.2017
GB18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2018/10]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
LU07.03.2017
FR31.03.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2018/07]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
FR31.03.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2017/51]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
SM18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2017/50]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
DK18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
MC18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2017/49]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
EE18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RO18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
SK18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2017/48]AT18.01.2017
CZ18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Former [2017/40]AT18.01.2017
ES18.01.2017
FI18.01.2017
HR18.01.2017
LT18.01.2017
LV18.01.2017
NL18.01.2017
PL18.01.2017
RS18.01.2017
SE18.01.2017
BG18.04.2017
NO18.04.2017
GR19.04.2017
IS18.05.2017
PT18.05.2017
Documents cited:Search   [] - No further relevant documents disclosed,
International search[A]JPH07310651  (TOSHIBA SEIKI KK);
 [A]JP2008190517  (OTOGAO KAZUMORI)
by applicantJPH07310651