Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2830770

EP2830770 - BRAKE MECHANISM FOR AN ELECTRONIC PIPETTE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.09.2018
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.05.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.11.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL, PT
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sartorius Biohit Liquid Handling Oy
Laippatie 1
00880 Helsinki / FI
[2015/06]
Inventor(s)01 / HINTIKKA, Ville
Vehkaniityntie 12 A
02180 Espoo / FI
 [2015/06]
Representative(s)Seppo Laine Oy
Porkkalankatu 24
00180 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2018/41]Seppo Laine Oy
Itämerenkatu 3 B
00180 Helsinki / FI
Former [2015/06]Laurén, Hanna , et al
Oy Jalo Ant-Wuorinen Ab
Iso-Roobertinkatu 4-6 A
00120 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date13768512.902.04.2013
[2018/41]
WO2013FI50359
Priority number, dateFI2012000537230.03.2012         Original published format: FI 20125372
[2015/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013144457
Date:03.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2830770
Date:04.02.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2013
[2015/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2830770
Date:10.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE03.10.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:B01L3/02, // F16D63/00
[2018/21]
Former International [2015/06]B01L3/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/06]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:BREMSMECHANISMUS FÜR EINE ELEKTRONISCHE PIPETTE[2015/06]
English:BRAKE MECHANISM FOR AN ELECTRONIC PIPETTE[2015/06]
French:MÉCANISME DE FREINAGE POUR PIPETTE ÉLECTRONIQUE[2015/06]
Entry into regional phase08.10.2014National basic fee paid 
08.10.2014Search fee paid 
08.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
08.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/06]
18.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.02.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
05.04.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.08.2018Fee for grant paid
29.08.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.08.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.11.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
28.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
13.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
23.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL10.10.2018
AT10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
RS10.10.2018
SE10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
PT10.02.2019
[2019/26]
Former [2019/25]AT10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
RS10.10.2018
SE10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
Former [2019/24]AT10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
SE10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
Former [2019/23]AT10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
Former [2019/22]FI10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
Former [2019/21]FI10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
NO10.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
Former [2019/20]LT10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
NO10.01.2019
Former [2019/17]NL10.10.2018
Documents cited:Search[X]US2002020233  (BABA NOBUYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0058] - [0066]; figures 2, 5 *;
 [X]EP0801983  (LABSYSTEMS OY [FI]) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * column 3, line 20 - column 4, line 55 * * figures 2,3,5,7 *;
 [A]US2175601  (WILLIAM GRUND) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9116974  (BIOHIT OY [FI]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *
International search[A]US5879633  (TERVAMAEKI JUKKA [FI], et al);
 [A]US6532837  (MAGUSSEN JR HAAKON T [US], et al);
 [A]US2002020233  (BABA NOBUYUKI [JP], et al)
ExaminationJPH01210039
by applicantFI87740B
 US2002020233
 EP0801983