Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2830771

EP2830771 - PIPETTE ADJUSTEMENT WHEEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.04.2018
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sartorius Biohit Liquid Handling Oy
Laippatie 1
00880 Helsinki / FI
[2015/06]
Inventor(s)01 / HINTIKKA, Ville
Vehkaniityntie 12 A
FI-02180 Espoo / FI
 [2015/06]
Representative(s)Seppo Laine Oy
Porkkalankatu 24
00180 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2015/06]Laurén, Hanna , et al
Oy Jalo Ant-Wuorinen Ab
Iso-Roobertinkatu 4-6 A
00120 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date13768896.602.04.2013
WO2013FI50358
Priority number, dateFI2012000536930.03.2012         Original published format: FI 20125369
[2015/06]
Filing languageFI
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013144456
Date:03.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2830771
Date:04.02.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2013
[2015/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE03.10.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:B01L3/02, H01H19/00, G05G1/08, G05G5/05, H01H19/14, H01H19/60
[2016/02]
Former International [2015/06]B01L3/02, H01H19/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/06]
TitleGerman:PIPETTENEINSTELLRAD[2015/06]
English:PIPETTE ADJUSTEMENT WHEEL[2015/06]
French:MOLETTE DE RÉGLAGE POUR PIPETTE[2015/06]
Entry into regional phase08.10.2014National basic fee paid 
08.10.2014Search fee paid 
08.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
08.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/06]
01.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.04.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
28.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
13.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
23.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
15.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2007229456  (PIHLAJA PEKKA [FI]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0024] , [0025] * * figures 1-3 * [I] 3-13;
 [XI]US6128006  (ROSENBERG LOUIS B [US] ET AL) [X] 1,11,12 * figures 1, 2 * * column 2, line 51 - line 54 * * column 3, line 30 - line 32 * * column 4, line 39 * * column 9, line 65 - column 10, line 13 * * column 18, line 11 - line 15 * * column 13, lines 18-22, 61-66 * [I] 2-10,13
International search[X]EP1632840  (GILSON SAS);
 [X]EP1543879  (GILSON SAS);
 [A]US5613600  (YOKOJI SHIGERU ET AL);
 [A]US2011214518  (HOFFMANN MARCEL ET AL);
 [A]US2008011042  (MOLITOR PETER ET AL)