Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2897822

EP2897822 - SUSPENSION SYSTEM FOR A DRIVER'S COMPARTMENT OF A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.07.2017
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Daf Trucks N.V.
Hugo van der Goeslaan 1
5643 TW Eindhoven / NL
[2015/31]
Inventor(s)01 / VAN DER KNAAP, Albertus Clemens Maria
c/o Hugo van der Goeslaan 1
NL-5643 TW Eindhoven / NL
02 / BEENAKKERS, Menno Adrianus
Beelstraat 5
NL-5121 AS Rijen / NL
03 / VANDENHOUDT, Jeroen
Zandbosweg 22
NL-5751 CE Deurne / NL
04 / GROH, Christian
Dorfstraße 4
D-66453 Gersheim / DE
05 / FUCHS, Patrik
Fliederweg 2
D-66459 Kirkel / DE
06 / KATTLER, Frank
Sommerbergstraße 41
D-66346 Püttlingen / DE
 [2015/31]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2016/36]
Former [2015/31]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date13771229.523.09.2013
[2016/36]
WO2013NL50678
Priority number, dateNL2012200950424.09.2012         Original published format: NL 2009504
[2015/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014046545
Date:27.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2897822
Date:29.07.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2014
[2015/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2897822
Date:07.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:B60G17/052, B60G99/00, B62D33/06, F16K1/44, F16K31/06
[2015/31]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/31]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUFHÄNGUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EIN FAHRERHAUS EINES FAHRZEUGS[2016/15]
English:SUSPENSION SYSTEM FOR A DRIVER'S COMPARTMENT OF A VEHICLE[2015/31]
French:SYSTÈME DE SUSPENSION POUR UNE CABINE DE VÉHICULE[2016/15]
Former [2015/31]AUFHÄNGUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EINE FAHRERKABINE EINES FAHRZEUGS
Former [2015/31]SYSTÈME DE SUSPENSION POUR UN COMPARTIMENT DU CONDUCTEUR D'UN VÉHICULE
Entry into regional phase23.04.2015National basic fee paid 
23.04.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
23.04.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/31]
16.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.04.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.07.2016Fee for grant paid
25.07.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.07.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.04.2016
Opposition(s)08.06.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU23.09.2013
AL07.09.2016
CY07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
DK07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
MC07.09.2016
MK07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SI07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
TR07.09.2016
IE23.09.2016
LU23.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
MT30.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
[2018/47]
Former [2018/45]HU23.09.2013
CY07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
DK07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
MC07.09.2016
MK07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SI07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
TR07.09.2016
IE23.09.2016
LU23.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
MT30.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
Former [2018/32]HU23.09.2013
CY07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
DK07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
MC07.09.2016
MK07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SI07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
IE23.09.2016
LU23.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
MT30.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
Former [2018/30]HU23.09.2013
CY07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
DK07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
MC07.09.2016
MK07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SI07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
IE23.09.2016
LU23.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
Former [2017/41]CZ07.09.2016
DK07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SI07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
IE23.09.2016
LU23.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
Former [2017/37]CZ07.09.2016
DK07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SI07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
IE23.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
Former [2017/35]CZ07.09.2016
DK07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
IE23.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
Former [2017/34]CZ07.09.2016
DK07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
IE23.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
Former [2017/32]CZ07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
IE23.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
Former [2017/13]FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
Former [2017/11]FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
NO07.12.2016
Former [2017/09]FI07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
NO07.12.2016
Former [2017/07]LT07.09.2016
Cited inInternational search[AD]DE102009012581  (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [AD] 1 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0032]; figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0036] , [0037] *;
 [A]DE19536607  (JOHNSON SERVICE CO [US]) [A] 1-3 * column 3, line 8 - line 36; figure 3 *;
 [A]DE10353011  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-5,7 * paragraphs [0004] - [0008] - [0021] , [0038]; figures 4,5 *;
 [A]DE19632379  (FESTO AG & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 45 - line 59; figure 3 * * column 7, line 22 - line 37 *;
 [A]EP1734296  (KOGANEI LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0015]; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE102010012413  (GUDZULIC MIRO [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1,5; claims 1,4 *
by applicantDE102009012581
 WO2010019038