blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2895302 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2895302



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 176
20.12.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
16.02.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
19.01.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
03.01.2017 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
03.01.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
03.01.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
02.01.2017 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
02.01.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
02.01.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
02.12.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
07.09.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
07.09.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
07.09.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
07.09.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 17
07.09.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 17
30.06.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
30.06.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
30.06.2016 Claims Search / examination 2
30.06.2016 Description Search / examination 2
30.06.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
29.03.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
29.03.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
15.03.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
14.01.2016 Statement of non-availability of priority search results Search / examination 1
05.01.2016 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
24.06.2015 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
04.05.2015 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
31.03.2015 Comments on Written Opinion of ISA Search / examination 4
31.03.2015 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
31.03.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
31.03.2015 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 8
23.01.2015 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
22.05.2014 Republication of A1/A2 Pamphlet -amended claims and/or statement Search / examination 4
09.04.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 19
20.03.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
20.03.2014 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 18
30.01.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
30.01.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
30.01.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 4
01.10.2013 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
01.10.2013 Claims PCT receiving Office 2
01.10.2013 Description PCT receiving Office 12
01.10.2013 Drawings PCT receiving Office 2