blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2895302


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
28.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.07.2019  [2019/31]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
24.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
10.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.09.2018  [2018/37]
27.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.08.2018  [2018/35]
20.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
15.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.07.2018  [2018/29]
02.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.04.2018  [2018/14]
22.12.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  24.01.2018  [2018/04]
01.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.01.2018  [2018/01]
24.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.12.2017  [2017/52]
17.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.12.2017  [2017/51]
10.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.12.2017  [2017/50]
03.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.12.2017  [2017/49]
27.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.11.2017  [2017/48]
20.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.11.2017  [2017/47]
13.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
06.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.11.2017  [2017/45]
29.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.11.2017  [2017/44]
22.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.10.2017  [2017/43]
15.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.10.2017  [2017/42]
08.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.10.2017  [2017/41]
13.01.2017 (Expected) grant published on  15.02.2017  [2017/07]
04.01.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
06.12.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
06.12.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
04.10.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.09.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
01.07.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
05.04.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
25.03.2016 First examination report
20.11.2015 Change - extension states published on  23.12.2015  [2015/52]
02.10.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.06.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  22.07.2015  [2015/30]
19.06.2015 Request for examination filed published on  22.07.2015  [2015/30]
11.04.2015 Change - representative
11.04.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
11.04.2015 Amendment by applicant
02.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
21.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
12.10.2013 PCT data prior to European publication