blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2895302
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9611875Global Dossier 04.04.2017B2
US2015226244 13.08.2015A1
Priority number Date
DE102012018175 14.09.2012
WO2013EP02739 12.09.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2895302Global Dossier 15.02.2017B1
EP2895302 22.07.2015A1
Priority number Date
DE102012018175 14.09.2012
WO2013EP02739 12.09.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2014040735Global Dossier 22.05.2014A4
WO2014040735 20.03.2014A1
Priority number Date
DE102012018175 14.09.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE102012018175 12.12.2013B3
Priority number Date
DE102012018175 14.09.2012