Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2895302

EP2895302 - UNIVERSAL HOLDING CLAMP FOR HOLDING OBJECTS OF ANY DESIRED TYPE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.12.2017
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.01.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Likosar, Ferdinand
Im Wingert 34
6719 Bludesch / AT
For all designated states
Likosar, Juliane
Im Wingert 34
6719 Bludesch / AT
[2015/30]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2015/30]
Representative(s)Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt, Rennerle 10
88131 Lindau / DE
[2015/30]
Application number, filing date13771380.612.09.2013
[2017/07]
WO2013EP02739
Priority number, dateDE2012101817514.09.2012         Original published format: DE102012018175
[2015/30]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014040735
Date:20.03.2014
Language:DE
[2014/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2895302
Date:22.07.2015
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2014
[2015/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2895302
Date:15.02.2017
Language:DE
[2017/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:B25H3/04
[2015/30]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/30]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:UNIVERSAL-KLEMMHALTER ZUR HALTERUNG VON GEGENSTÄNDEN BELIEBIGER ART[2015/30]
English:UNIVERSAL HOLDING CLAMP FOR HOLDING OBJECTS OF ANY DESIRED TYPE[2015/30]
French:SUPPORT DE SERRAGE UNIVERSEL DESTINÉ À RETENIR TOUT TYPE D'OBJET[2015/30]
Entry into regional phase01.04.2015National basic fee paid 
01.04.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
01.04.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/30]
29.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.06.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.09.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.12.2016Fee for grant paid
02.12.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.01.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.03.2016
Opposition(s)16.11.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.09.2013
CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
ES15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
IT15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
MC15.02.2017
MT15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
SM15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
GB12.09.2017
IE12.09.2017
LU12.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/43]CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
ES15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
IT15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
MC15.02.2017
MT15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
SM15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
GB12.09.2017
IE12.09.2017
LU12.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
Former [2018/37]CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
ES15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
IT15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
MC15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
SM15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
GB12.09.2017
IE12.09.2017
LU12.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
Former [2018/35]CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
ES15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
IT15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
MC15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
SM15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
GB12.09.2017
IE12.09.2017
LU12.09.2017
Former [2018/34]CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
ES15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
IT15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
MC15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
SM15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
IE12.09.2017
LU12.09.2017
Former [2018/29]CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
ES15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
IT15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
MC15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
SM15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2018/14]CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
ES15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
IT15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
SM15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2017/51]CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
ES15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
IT15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
SM15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2017/50]CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
ES15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
IT15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2017/49]CZ15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
ES15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
IT15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ15.02.2017
ES15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2017/41]ES15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP1936209  (LINDE AG [DE]) [X] 1,3 * paragraphs [0001] , [0021] , [0022] , [0027] , [0034]; figure 4 * [Y] 2,4-10;
 [YDA]EP0381224  (HEINZLE EGON) [YD] 5,7-9 * column 3, lines 41-44 * * column 4, lines 2-9 * * figures 1,2,5 * [A] 1;
 [Y]US2012049020  (STOCK DANIEL F [US]) [Y] 2,10 * paragraphs [0018] , [0019]; figures 1,4 *;
 [Y]WO9624004  (BURTON CORP [US], et al) [Y] 4 * figures 1-6 *;
 [Y]US3265032  (HUME PATRICK H) [Y] 5 * figures 1-3 *;
 [YA]US6105915  (NAMAN MARC [FR], et al) [Y] 6 * column 3, lines 9-13 * * column 4, lines 19-22; figures 1,2 * [A] 1;
 [A]DE102005027202  (FRIMO GROUP GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,3 * paragraph [0015]; figures 1,2 *
by applicantEP0381224
 AT391795B
 DE4437257