Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2841089

EP2841089 - COMPOSITIONS, METHODS AND ASSAYS COMPRISING AMYLIN OR AMLYIN ANALOGS FOR ABETA-PEPTIDE MEDIATED DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.06.2018
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.07.2018  [2018/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Trustees of Boston University
One Silber Way
Boston, MA 02215 / US
[2015/10]
Inventor(s)01 / QUI, Wendy Wei Qiao
265 Dean Road
Brookline, Massachusetts 02445 / US
 [2015/10]
Representative(s)Brown, David Leslie
Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/10]Brown, David Leslie
Haseltine Lake LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
Application number, filing date13772037.114.03.2013
WO2013US31567
Priority number, dateUS201261619696P03.04.2012         Original published format: US 201261619696 P
[2015/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013151729
Date:10.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2841089
Date:04.03.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.2013
[2015/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR10.10.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/22, A61K38/28, A61P25/28, A61P25/00
[2015/10]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/10]
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, VERFAHREN UND ASSAYS MIT AMYLIN ODER AMLYINANALOGA FÜR ABETA-PEPTID-VERMITTELTE ERKRANKUNGEN[2015/10]
English:COMPOSITIONS, METHODS AND ASSAYS COMPRISING AMYLIN OR AMLYIN ANALOGS FOR ABETA-PEPTIDE MEDIATED DISORDERS[2015/10]
French:COMPOSITIONS, PROCÉDÉS ET DOSAGES COMPRENANT DE L'AMYLINE OU DES ANALOGUES DE L'AMLYINE POUR TROUBLES À MÉDIATION PAR LE PEPTIDE A-BÊTA[2015/10]
Entry into regional phase01.10.2014National basic fee paid 
01.10.2014Search fee paid 
01.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
01.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/10]
23.12.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.09.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.02.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/29]
09.03.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/29]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.02.2017
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
23.12.2016Request for further processing filed
23.12.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
11.01.2017Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201806   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0224727  (UNIV TORONTO [CA]; FRASER PAUL [CA]) [X] 1,2,9-15 * figure 2 * * page 32 - page 33 * * claims 1-61 *;
 [X]US2001007015  (KAPURNIOTU AFRODITI [DE] ET AL) [X] 1,2,9-15 * paragraphs [0007] , [0015] , [0040] , [0041] *
 [T]  - ADLER BRITTANY L ET AL, "Neuroprotective effects of the amylin analogue pramlintide on Alzheimer's disease pathogenesis and cognition", NEUROBIOLOGY OF AGING, (20131011), vol. 35, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.NEUROBIOLAGING.2013.10.076, ISSN 0197-4580, pages 793 - 801, XP028807286

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.neurobiolaging.2013.10.076
 [Y]  - O. SCHMITZ ET AL, "Amylin Agonists: A Novel Approach in the Treatment of Diabetes", DIABETES, (20041201), vol. 53, no. suppl_3, doi:10.2337/diabetes.53.suppl_3.S233, ISSN 0012-1797, pages S233 - S238, XP055032108 [Y] 1,2,9-15 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2337/diabetes.53.suppl_3.S233
 [I]  - KAPURNIOTU A ET AL, "Conformational Restriction via Cyclization in sz-Amyloid Peptide Asz(1-28) Leads to an Inhibitor of Asz(1-28) Amyloidogenesis and Cytotoxicity", CHEMISTRY AND BIOLOGY, CURRENT BIOLOGY, LONDON, GB, vol. 10, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S1074-5521(03)00022-X, ISSN 1074-5521, (20030201), pages 149 - 159, (20030201), XP026904712 [I] 1,2,9-15 * Summary, Introduction and Discussion *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1074-5521(03)00022-X
 [IY]  - LI-MEI YAN ET AL, "IAPP Mimic Blocks A[beta] Cytotoxic Self-Assembly: Cross-Suppression of Amyloid Toxicity of A[beta] and IAPP Suggests a Molecular Link between Alzheimer's Disease and Type II Diabetes", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE INTERNATIONAL EDITION, (20070104), vol. 46, no. 8, doi:10.1002/anie.200604056, ISSN 1433-7851, pages 1246 - 1252, XP055159707 [I] 1,2,9-15 * the whole document * [Y] 1,2,9-15

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.200604056
 [I]  - ERIKA ANDREETTO ET AL, "Dissecting the Role of Single Regions of an IAPP Mimic and IAPP in Inhibition of A[beta]40 Amyloid Formation and Cytotoxicity", CHEMBIOCHEM, (20110531), vol. 12, no. 9, doi:10.1002/cbic.201100192, ISSN 1439-4227, pages 1313 - 1322, XP055159711 [I] 1,2,9-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cbic.201100192
 [I]  - ERIKA ANDREETTO ET AL, "Identification of Hot Regions of the A[beta]-IAPP Interaction Interface as High-Affinity Binding Sites in both Cross- and Self-Association", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE INTERNATIONAL EDITION, (20100322), vol. 49, no. 17, doi:10.1002/anie.200904902, ISSN 1433-7851, pages 3081 - 3085, XP055159706 [I] 1,2,9-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.200904902
 [I]  - NASROLLAH REZAEI-GHALEH ET AL, "Interaction between Amyloid Beta Peptide and an Aggregation Blocker Peptide Mimicking Islet Amyloid Polypeptide", PLOS ONE, (20110525), vol. 6, no. 5, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0020289, page e20289, XP055220645 [I] 1,2,9-15 * Introduction *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0020289
International search[X]US2010221240  (KAPURNIOTU AFRODITI ET AL.);
 [Y]  - PATHURI ET AL., "Radiosynthesis and in vivo evaluation of a F-18-labeled pancreatic islet amyloid inhibitor", JOURNAL OF LABELLED COMPOUNDS AND RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS, (2010), vol. 53, no. 4, pages 186 - 191, XP055164786

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jlcr.1748
 [Y]  - DEMATTOS ET AL., "'Peripheral anti-Abeta antibody alters CNS and plasma Abeta clearance and decreases brain Abeta burden in a mouse model of Alzheimer's disease'", PNAS, (2001), vol. 98, no. 15, pages 8850 - 8855, XP001156930

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.151261398
 [A]  - THAMBISETTY ET AL., "'Blood-based biomarkers of Alzheimer's disease: challenging but feasible'", BIOMARKERS IN MEDICINE, (2010), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 65 - 79, XP001539714
 [A]  - ZDROJEWICZ ET AL., "'AMYLIN-STRUCTURE, FUNCTION, CLINICAL MEANING", WIADCZALNA I KLINICZNA, (2006), vol. 6, no. 4, pages 169 - 172, XP055164789
 [A]  - SCHULTZ, "Studies on islet amyloid polypeptide aggregation: from model organism to molecular mechanisms", LINKOPING UNIVERSITY MEDICAL DISSERTATIONS NO.1254, DEPARTMENT OF CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, LINKOPING UNIVERSITY, SWEDEN, (2011), XP055164791