Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2835371

EP2835371 - INDUSTRIAL METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING HIGH-PURITY METHIOZOLINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.09.2017
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Korea Research Institute of Chemical Technology
141 Gajeong-ro
Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 305-343 / KR
For all designated states
Moghu Research Center Ltd.
Room 311 Business Incubation Center
125 Gwahak-ro
Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 305-806 / KR
[2015/07]
Inventor(s)01 / KO, Young Kwan
102-1702 Hanbit Apt.
Eoeun-dong
Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 305-755 / KR
02 / KOO, Dong Wan
103-401 Unam Neomia Apt.
524 Deongmyeong-dong
Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 305-734 / KR
03 / WOO, Jae Chun
110-608 Gyeongnam Apt.
193 Doma 2(i)-dong
Seo-gu
Daejeon 302-763 / KR
04 / RYU, Jae Wook
Room 101
Neulpureun House
621-5 Juk-dong
Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 305-328 / KR
05 / KOO, Suk Jin
403-801 Expo Apt.
Jeonmin-dong
Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 305-762 / KR
06 / HWANG, Ki Hwan
105-503 Chonggu Narae Apt.
Jeonmin-dong
Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 305-729 / KR
07 / LEE, Dong Guk
Room 302
Euncholong
239-2 Yongmun-dong
Seo-gu
Daejeon 302-844 / KR
08 / CHUNG, Kun Hoe
205-403 Banseokmaeul Apt.
Jijok-dong
Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 305-772 / KR
09 / JEON, Man Seok
606-1401 Centralcity
Bongmyeong-dong
Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 305-301 / KR
10 / KIM, Sung Hun
Room 610
Daechung Apt.
302-94 Samseong 2-dong
Dong-gu
Daejeon 300-815 / KR
11 / LIM, Jong Su
Room 306
Onnuri Villa
269-13 Yongmun-dong
Seo-gu
Daejeon 302-845 / KR
12 / CHO, Nam Gyu
Room 811
Yuseong Campus Tower
641 Bongmyeong-dong
Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 305-301 / KR
 [2015/07]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2016/43]
Former [2015/07]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date13772127.018.03.2013
[2016/43]
WO2013KR02160
Priority number, dateKR2012003383502.04.2012         Original published format: KR 20120033835
[2015/07]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013151250
Date:10.10.2013
Language:KO
[2013/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2835371
Date:11.02.2015
Language:EN
[2015/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2835371
Date:26.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR10.10.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:C07D413/04
[2015/07]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/07]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:INDUSTRIELLES VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HOCHREINEM METHIOZOLIN[2015/07]
English:INDUSTRIAL METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING HIGH-PURITY METHIOZOLINE[2015/07]
French:PROCÉDÉ INDUSTRIEL POUR LA FABRICATION DE MÉTHIOZOLINE DE PURETÉ ÉLEVÉE[2015/07]
Entry into regional phase30.10.2014Translation filed 
30.10.2014National basic fee paid 
30.10.2014Search fee paid 
30.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
30.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/07]
09.05.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.09.2016Fee for grant paid
07.09.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.09.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.05.2016
Opposition(s)27.07.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201503   M06   Fee paid on   15.07.2015
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU18.03.2013
AT26.10.2016
BE26.10.2016
CZ26.10.2016
DK26.10.2016
EE26.10.2016
ES26.10.2016
FI26.10.2016
HR26.10.2016
IT26.10.2016
LT26.10.2016
LV26.10.2016
MC26.10.2016
NL26.10.2016
PL26.10.2016
RO26.10.2016
RS26.10.2016
SE26.10.2016
SI26.10.2016
SK26.10.2016
SM26.10.2016
BG26.01.2017
NO26.01.2017
GR27.01.2017
IS26.02.2017
PT27.02.2017
IE18.03.2017
LU18.03.2017
MT18.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
FR31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/43]AT26.10.2016
BE26.10.2016
CZ26.10.2016
DK26.10.2016
EE26.10.2016
ES26.10.2016
FI26.10.2016
HR26.10.2016
IT26.10.2016
LT26.10.2016
LV26.10.2016
MC26.10.2016
NL26.10.2016
PL26.10.2016
RO26.10.2016
RS26.10.2016
SE26.10.2016
SI26.10.2016
SK26.10.2016
SM26.10.2016
BG26.01.2017
NO26.01.2017
GR27.01.2017
IS26.02.2017
PT27.02.2017
IE18.03.2017
LU18.03.2017
MT18.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
FR31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
Former [2018/13]AT26.10.2016
BE26.10.2016
CZ26.10.2016
DK26.10.2016
EE26.10.2016
ES26.10.2016
FI26.10.2016
HR26.10.2016
IT26.10.2016
LT26.10.2016
LV26.10.2016
MC26.10.2016
NL26.10.2016
PL26.10.2016
RO26.10.2016
RS26.10.2016
SE26.10.2016
SI26.10.2016
SK26.10.2016
SM26.10.2016
BG26.01.2017
NO26.01.2017
GR27.01.2017
IS26.02.2017
PT27.02.2017
IE18.03.2017
LU18.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
FR31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
Former [2018/10]AT26.10.2016
BE26.10.2016
CZ26.10.2016
DK26.10.2016
EE26.10.2016
ES26.10.2016
FI26.10.2016
HR26.10.2016
IT26.10.2016
LT26.10.2016
LV26.10.2016
MC26.10.2016
NL26.10.2016
PL26.10.2016
RO26.10.2016
RS26.10.2016
SE26.10.2016
SI26.10.2016
SK26.10.2016
SM26.10.2016
BG26.01.2017
NO26.01.2017
GR27.01.2017
IS26.02.2017
PT27.02.2017
LU18.03.2017
FR31.03.2017
Former [2018/07]AT26.10.2016
BE26.10.2016
CZ26.10.2016
DK26.10.2016
EE26.10.2016
ES26.10.2016
FI26.10.2016
HR26.10.2016
IT26.10.2016
LT26.10.2016
LV26.10.2016
MC26.10.2016
NL26.10.2016
PL26.10.2016
RO26.10.2016
RS26.10.2016
SE26.10.2016
SI26.10.2016
SK26.10.2016
SM26.10.2016
BG26.01.2017
NO26.01.2017
GR27.01.2017
IS26.02.2017
PT27.02.2017
FR31.03.2017
Former [2017/52]AT26.10.2016
BE26.10.2016
CZ26.10.2016
DK26.10.2016
EE26.10.2016
ES26.10.2016
FI26.10.2016
HR26.10.2016
IT26.10.2016
LT26.10.2016
LV26.10.2016
MC26.10.2016
NL26.10.2016
PL26.10.2016
RO26.10.2016
RS26.10.2016
SE26.10.2016
SI26.10.2016
SK26.10.2016
SM26.10.2016
BG26.01.2017
NO26.01.2017
GR27.01.2017
IS26.02.2017
PT27.02.2017
Former [2017/38]AT26.10.2016
BE26.10.2016
CZ26.10.2016
DK26.10.2016
EE26.10.2016
ES26.10.2016
FI26.10.2016
HR26.10.2016
IT26.10.2016
LT26.10.2016
LV26.10.2016
NL26.10.2016
PL26.10.2016
RO26.10.2016
RS26.10.2016
SE26.10.2016
SK26.10.2016
SM26.10.2016
BG26.01.2017
NO26.01.2017
GR27.01.2017
IS26.02.2017
PT27.02.2017
Former [2017/37]AT26.10.2016
BE26.10.2016
CZ26.10.2016
DK26.10.2016
EE26.10.2016
ES26.10.2016
FI26.10.2016
HR26.10.2016
IT26.10.2016
LT26.10.2016
LV26.10.2016
NL26.10.2016
PL26.10.2016
RO26.10.2016
RS26.10.2016
SE26.10.2016
SK26.10.2016
SM26.10.2016
NO26.01.2017
GR27.01.2017
IS26.02.2017
PT27.02.2017
Former [2017/36]AT26.10.2016
BE26.10.2016
CZ26.10.2016
DK26.10.2016
EE26.10.2016
ES26.10.2016
FI26.10.2016
HR26.10.2016
LT26.10.2016
LV26.10.2016
NL26.10.2016
PL26.10.2016
RO26.10.2016
RS26.10.2016
SE26.10.2016
SK26.10.2016
NO26.01.2017
GR27.01.2017
IS26.02.2017
PT27.02.2017
Former [2017/34]AT26.10.2016
BE26.10.2016
CZ26.10.2016
DK26.10.2016
ES26.10.2016
FI26.10.2016
HR26.10.2016
LT26.10.2016
LV26.10.2016
NL26.10.2016
PL26.10.2016
RS26.10.2016
SE26.10.2016
NO26.01.2017
GR27.01.2017
IS26.02.2017
PT27.02.2017
Former [2017/33]AT26.10.2016
BE26.10.2016
DK26.10.2016
ES26.10.2016
FI26.10.2016
HR26.10.2016
LT26.10.2016
LV26.10.2016
NL26.10.2016
PL26.10.2016
RS26.10.2016
SE26.10.2016
NO26.01.2017
GR27.01.2017
IS26.02.2017
PT27.02.2017
Former [2017/26]AT26.10.2016
BE26.10.2016
ES26.10.2016
FI26.10.2016
HR26.10.2016
LT26.10.2016
LV26.10.2016
NL26.10.2016
PL26.10.2016
RS26.10.2016
SE26.10.2016
NO26.01.2017
GR27.01.2017
IS26.02.2017
PT27.02.2017
Former [2017/12]LV26.10.2016
Documents cited:Search   [] - No further relevant documents disclosed,
International search[Y]US6838416  (RYU EUNG-KUL [KR], et al);
 [Y]  - NAM, J. H. ET AL., "Synthesis and Herbicidal Activities of Enantiopure Methiozolines.", BULLETIN OF THE KOREAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (20120120), vol. 33, no. 1, pages 297 - 300, XP055171516

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.5012/bkcs.2012.33.1.297
 [A]  - HWANG, I. T. ET AL., "5-(2,6-Difluorobenzyl)oxymethyl-5-methyl-3-(3-methylthiophen-2- yl)-1,2-isoxazoline as a Useful Rice Herbicide.", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, (2005), vol. 53, pages 8639 - 8643, XP055171520

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf051284f
by applicantUS6838416
 US7998902
    - J. AGRIC. FOOD CHEM., (2005), vol. 53, pages 8639 - 8643,
    - BULL. KOREAN CHEM. SOC., (2012), vol. 33, no. 1, pages 297 - 300,