Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2834265

EP2834265 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR DENGUE VIRUS EPITOPES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.01.2018
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip08.10.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill
308 Bynum Hall
Campus Box 4105
Chapel Hill, NC 27599 / US
For all designated states
Vanderbilt University
305 Kirkland Hall
2201 West End Avenue
Nashville, TN 37240 / US
[N/P]
Former [2015/07]For all designated states
The University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill
308 Bynum Hall Campus Box 4105
Chapel Hill, NC 27599 / US
For all designated states
Vanderbilt University
305 Kirkland Hall
2201 West End Avenue
Nashville, TN 37240 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DE SILVA, Aravinda M.
419 Whitehead Circle
Chapel Hill North Carolina 27514 / US
02 / DE ALWIS, A. Ruklanthi
5/2 Waidya Place
Dehiwala / LK
03 / WAHALA, Wahala M.P.B.
2000 Baity Hill Drive
Chapel Hill North Carolina 27514 / US
04 / BARIC, Ralph S.
2600 North Stream Court
Haw River North Carolina 27258 / US
05 / MESSER, William B.
4605 NW Woodside Terrace
Portland Oregon 97210 / US
06 / CROWE, JR., James E.
2101 20 Avenue South
Nashville Tennessee 37212 / US
07 / SMITH, Scott A.
2929 Selena Drive J123
Nashville Tennessee 37211 / US
 [2015/07]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
1 City Walk
Leeds LS11 9DX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/07]HGF Limited
Belgrave Hall
Belgrave Street
Leeds LS2 8DD / GB
Application number, filing date13772201.315.03.2013
WO2013US32367
Priority number, dateUS201261619247P02.04.2012         Original published format: US 201261619247 P
[2015/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013151764
Date:10.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2834265
Date:11.02.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.2013
[2015/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR10.10.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/18, C07K19/00, C12N15/40, A61K39/12, A61P31/14
[2015/07]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/07]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR DENGUE-VIRUS-EPITOPE[2015/07]
English:METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR DENGUE VIRUS EPITOPES[2015/07]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS POUR DES ÉPITOPES DU VIRUS DE LA DENGUE[2015/07]
Entry into regional phase29.10.2014National basic fee paid 
29.10.2014Search fee paid 
29.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
29.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/07]
22.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.10.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.01.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XP]WO2012082073  (UNIV SINGAPORE [SG], et al) [XP] 1,13 * page 33, line 21 - line 23 * * page 34 - page 35; table 2 * * page 19, paragraph 0089 *;
 [XI]  - ADRIANA S. AZEVEDO ET AL, "DNA Vaccines against Dengue Virus Type 2 Based on Truncate Envelope Protein or Its Domain III", PLOS ONE, (20110711), vol. 6, no. 7, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0020528, page e20528, XP055207118 [X] 2,3,9-12,14,15 * abstract * * figures 1,3, 4, 5 * * page 6, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 5, column l, paragraph 2 - column r, paragraph 1 * * page 5, column l, paragraph 1 - page 6, column l2 * [I] 13

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0020528
 [XI]  - KONISHI E ET AL, "Dengue type 2 virus subviral extracellular particles produced by a stably transfected mammalian cell line and their evaluation for a subunit vaccine", VACCINE, ELSEVIER LTD, GB, (20020115), vol. 20, no. 7-8, doi:10.1016/S0264-410X(01)00446-7, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 1058 - 1067, XP004332976 [X] 2,3,9-12,14,15 * abstract * * page 1063; table 3 * [I] 13

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0264-410X(01)00446-7
 [XI]  - CHAMBERS THOMAS J ET AL, "Yellow fever virus/dengue-2 virus and yellow fever virus/dengue-4 virus chimeras: biological characterization, immunogenicity, and protection against dengue encephalitis in the mouse model", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (20030301), vol. 77, no. 6, doi:10.1128/JVI.77.6.3655-3668.2003, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 3655 - 3668, XP002578961 [X] 3,10,12 * abstract * * page 3663, column r, paragraph 2 * [I] 6-8,13

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.77.6.3655-3668.2003
 [XI]  - GUIRAKHOO F ET AL, "Recombinant chimeric yellow fever-dengue type 2 virus is immunogenic and protective in nonhuman primates", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (20000601), vol. 74, no. 12, doi:10.1128/JVI.74.12.5477-5485.2000, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 5477 - 5485, XP002165591 [X] 3,10-12,14,15 * abstract * * page 5483, column r, paragraph 1 * [I] 6-8,13

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.74.12.5477-5485.2000
 [XI]  - GUIRAKHOO F ET AL, "Construction, safety and immunogenicity in nohuman primates of a chimeric yellow fever-dengue virus tetravalent vaccine", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (20010801), vol. 75, no. 16, doi:10.1128/JVI.75.16.7290-7304.2001, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 7290 - 7304, XP002964148 [X] 3,10-12,14,15 * abstract * * Materials and Methods * * page 7303, column l, line 2 * [I] 6-8,13

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.75.16.7290-7304.2001
 [XI]  - BIELEFELDT-OHMANN H ET AL, "ANALYSIS OF A RECOMBINANT DENGUE-2 VIRUS-DENGUE-3 VIRUS HYBRID ENVELOPPE PROTEIN EXPRESSED IN A SECRETORY BACULOVIRUS SYSTEM", JOURNAL OF GENERAL VIROLOGY, SOCIETY FOR GENERAL MICROBIOLOGY, SPENCERS WOOD, GB, (19971101), vol. 78, no. 11, ISSN 0022-1317, pages 2723 - 2733, XP000885552 [X] 1-4,9-12,14,15 * the whole document * * page 2726; table 1 * * page 2729, column r, paragraph 2 - page 2730, column l, paragraph 1 * * figure 6 * * Methods; page 2724 - page 2725 * * page 2725, column r, paragraph 2 * [I] 5-8,13
 [A]  - SIRITORN BUTRAPET ET AL, "Amino acid changes within the E protein hinge region that affect dengue virus type 2 infectivity and fusion", VIROLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 413, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.VIROL.2011.01.030, ISSN 0042-6822, (20110124), pages 118 - 127, (20110127), XP028159154 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 126, column l, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.virol.2011.01.030
 [A]  - HONG-EN LIN ET AL, "Analysis of Epitopes on Dengue Virus Envelope Protein Recognized by Monoclonal Antibodies and Polyclonal Human Sera by a High Throughput Assay", PLOS NEGLECTED TROPICAL DISEASES, (20120103), vol. 6, no. 1, doi:10.1371/journal.pntd.0001447, page e1447, XP055171297 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 5, column l, paragraph 1 - column r, paragraph 2 * * table 1 * * figure 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pntd.0001447
 [A]  - CRILL W D ET AL, "Localization and characterization of flavivirus envelope glycoprotein cross-reactive epitopes", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (20041201), vol. 78, no. 24, doi:10.1128/JVI.78.24.13975-13986.2004, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 13975 - 13986, XP002374044 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 2; tables 3, 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.78.24.13975-13986.2004
 [A]  - R. RAJAMANONMANI ET AL, "On a mouse monoclonal antibody that neutralizes all four dengue virus serotypes", JOURNAL OF GENERAL VIROLOGY, (20090304), vol. 90, no. 4, doi:10.1099/vir.0.006874-0, ISSN 0022-1317, pages 799 - 809, XP055207153 [A] 1-15 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1099/vir.0.006874-0
International search[A]US2005002968  (MONATH THOMAS P [US], et al);
 [A]US2008193477  (MONATH THOMAS P [US], et al)
 [XP]  - DE ALWIS, R. ET AL., "Identification of human neutralizing antibodies that bind to complex epitopes on dengue virions", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U S A, (20120412), vol. 109, no. 19, pages 7439 - 7444, XP055171295

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1200566109
 [A]  - GROMOWSKI, G. D. ET AL., "Characterization of dengue virus complex-specific neutralizing epitopes on envelope protein domain III of dengue 2 virus", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (20080618), vol. 82, no. 17, pages 8828 - 8837, XP055106042

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.00606-08
 [A]  - LIN, H.-E. ET AL., "Analysis of epitopes on dengue virus envelope protein recognized by monoclonal antibodies and polyclonal human sera by a high throughput assay", PLOS NEGLECTED TROPICAL DISEASE, (20120103), vol. 6, no. 1, page E1447, XP055171297

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pntd.0001447
 [A]  - WAHALA, W. M. P. B. ET AL., "Natural strain variation and antibody neutralization of dengue serotype 3 viruses", PLOS PATHOGENS, (20100319), vol. 6, no. 3, page E1000821, XP055171298

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.ppat.1000821