Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2835840

EP2835840 - ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENT ELEMENT AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.10.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Change - applicantpublished on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED
27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8260 / JP
[2019/51]
Former [2015/07]For all designated states
SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED
27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo
104-8260 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / MIMA, Shoji
c/o SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED
1-1 Oe-cho
Niihama-shi Ehime 792-0015 / JP
02 / ONO, Yoshinobu
c/o SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED
1-1 Oe-cho
Niihama-shi Ehime 792-0015 / JP
 [2015/07]
Representative(s)J A Kemp LLP
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/07]Jackson, Martin Peter
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date13772266.604.04.2013
WO2013JP60320
Priority number, dateJP2012008705306.04.2012         Original published format: JP 2012087053
[2015/07]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013151129
Date:10.10.2013
Language:JA
[2013/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2835840
Date:11.02.2015
Language:EN
[2015/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP10.10.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.01.2016
ClassificationInternational:H01L51/50, H01L51/54
[2016/04]
Former International [2015/07]H01L51/50, H05B33/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/07]
TitleGerman:ORGANISCHES ELEKTROLUMINESZENTES ELEMENT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON[2015/07]
English:ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENT ELEMENT AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SAME[2015/07]
French:ÉLÉMENT ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT ORGANIQUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION[2015/07]
Entry into regional phase02.10.2014Translation filed 
02.10.2014National basic fee paid 
02.10.2014Search fee paid 
02.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
02.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/07]
21.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.10.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.10.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.07.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
10.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
11.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
15.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[I]US2010197875  (FALCOU AURELIE [DE], et al) [I] 1-8 * paragraphs [0069] - [0074] - [0 63] , [0 66] * * table 1 *
International search[X]WO2010149258  (MERCK PATENT GMBH);
 [A]JP2007525564  (MERCK PATENT GMBH);
 [A]JP2007505958  (MERCK PATENT GMBH);
 [A]JP2011512424  (CAMBRIDGE DISPLAY TECHNOLOGY LTD.)
by applicantJP2009528400
 JPS6370257
 JPS63175860
 JPH02135359
 JPH02135361
 JPH02209988
 JPH0337992
 JPH03152184
 GB2300196
    - CHEM. REV., (1989), vol. 89, page 1359