Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2833837

EP2833837 - DEVICES AND METHODS FOR TREATING AN ANEURYSM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.02.2017
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.06.2019New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Merlin MD PTE Ltd.
8 Admiralty Street 06-08/09
Admirax Building Lobby 2
Singapore 757438 / SG
[2015/07]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHAEFER, Dean
402 Orchard Rd. 08-04
Delfi Singapore 238867 / SG
02 / BATIAO, Felizardo, Gratila
248 Tampines Street 21 11-263
Singapore 521248 / SG
03 / LEE, Siew, Yin
1 Simei Street 3 05-19
Singapore 529890 / SG
04 / FLAHERTY, J., Christopher
2122 Kirkland Lake Drive
Auburndale, FL 33823 / US
05 / SINGH, Dhirendra
7 Thomson Lane
18-05 Sky Eleven
Singapore 297725 / SG
 [2015/07]
Representative(s)CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP
Cannon Place
78 Cannon Street
London EC4N 6AF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/07]Hill, Justin John
Olswang LLP
90 High Holborn
London
WC1V 6XX / GB
Application number, filing date13773098.205.04.2013
WO2013US35517
Priority number, dateUS201261621434P06.04.2012         Original published format: US 201261621434 P
[2015/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013152327
Date:10.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2833837
Date:11.02.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.2013
[2015/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US10.10.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/24, A61F2/07
[2015/48]
Former International [2015/07]A61F2/24
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/07]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ANEURYSMEN[2015/07]
English:DEVICES AND METHODS FOR TREATING AN ANEURYSM[2015/07]
French:DISPOSITIFS ET MÉTHODES POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'UN ANÉVRISME[2015/07]
Entry into regional phase03.11.2014National basic fee paid 
03.11.2014Search fee paid 
03.11.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
03.11.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.11.2014Examination requested  [2015/07]
11.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.10.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.02.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.10.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
28.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
27.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
28.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201604   M06   Fee paid on   27.06.2016
30.04.201705   M06   Fee paid on   28.08.2017
30.04.201907   M06   Fee paid on   28.05.2019
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2010063582  (RUDAKOV LEON [US]) [X] 1,2,4,8,10,11,15 * the whole document * [Y] 3,6 [I] 5,7,9,12-14;
 [Y]US2011152998  (BEREZ AARON LEE [US] ET AL) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0216] - paragraph [0222]; figures 38-42 *;
 [Y]WO9416646  (SCHNEIDER USA INC [US]) [Y] 6 * abstract *
International search[X]US2010063582  (RUDAKOV LEON [US])
by applicantUS2010063582