Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2897888

EP2897888 - DEVICE WITH CHANGEABLE HOLDERS FOR GRIPPING AND CARRYING CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.02.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.02.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.03.2019  [2019/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Index-6 Limited Liability Company
28V Kuklensko shose Str.
4004 Plovdiv / BG
[2015/31]
Inventor(s)01 / SPASOV, Petar Georgiev
14 "Nikola Alvadjiev" str.
APP 19
BG-4002 Plovdiv / BG
02 / MINCHEV, Evgeni Ivanov
15 Borislav Street
floor 4
app. 8
BG-4000 Plovdiv / BG
03 / YUSEIN, Erol Yusein
2 Alexander Pushkin Street
floor 5
app. 13
BG-4000 Plovdiv / BG
 [2015/31]
Representative(s)Ilarionov, Pavko Jordanov
Manev & Partners
73 Patriarh Evtimii Blvd, fl.1
1463 Sofia / BG
[2015/31]
Application number, filing date13773585.829.08.2013
WO2013BG00042
Priority number, dateBG2012011130719.09.2012         Original published format: BG 11130712
[2015/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014043768
Date:27.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2897888
Date:29.07.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2014
[2015/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:B65G47/84
[2015/31]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/31]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG MIT AUSTAUSCHBAREN HALTERN ZUM GREIFEN UND TRANSPORTIEREN VON BEHÄLTERN[2015/31]
English:DEVICE WITH CHANGEABLE HOLDERS FOR GRIPPING AND CARRYING CONTAINERS[2015/31]
French:DISPOSITIF DOTÉ D'ÉLÉMENTS DE SUPPORT POUVANT ÊTRE CHANGÉS POUR LA PRÉHENSION ET LE SUPPORT DE CONTENEURS[2015/31]
Entry into regional phase02.09.2014National basic fee paid 
02.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
09.04.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/31]
30.04.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.09.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/10]
17.10.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2019/10]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.04.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
22.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
19.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201806   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]US4939890  (PERONEK MICHAEL H [US] ET AL) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US5778633  (SWEENY KEVIN M [US]) [A] 1 * column 7, line 65 - column 8, line 65; figures 3-9 *
by applicantEP1712496