blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2897888 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2897888



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 207
31.01.2019 Closing of application Search / examination 1
17.10.2018 Application deemed to be withdrawn ( translations of claims/payment missing from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
08.10.2018 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
30.04.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
30.04.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
30.04.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
30.04.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 19
30.04.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 16
05.04.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
25.07.2017 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
25.07.2017 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
18.07.2017 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
18.07.2017 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
18.07.2017 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
02.08.2016 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
02.08.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
19.01.2016 Statement of non-availability of priority search results Search / examination 1
05.01.2016 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
14.10.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
25.09.2015 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
25.09.2015 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
25.09.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
25.09.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
01.07.2015 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
22.06.2015 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
22.06.2015 Priority document Search / examination 18
20.06.2015 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
20.06.2015 Notification of submission or transmittal of priority document Search / examination 1
09.06.2015 Priority document not received from IB during Euro-PCT phase Search / examination 1
02.06.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
28.05.2015 Invitation to file priority document Search / examination 1
06.05.2015 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
06.05.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
04.05.2015 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
24.04.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.04.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.04.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
15.04.2015 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
15.04.2015 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
15.04.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
08.04.2015 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
08.04.2015 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
08.04.2015 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
08.04.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
08.04.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
30.09.2014 Information regarding early processing Search / examination 2
15.09.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
15.09.2014 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 8
15.09.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
15.09.2014 Annex Search / examination 16
15.09.2014 General authorisation Search / examination 1
15.09.2014 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 10
15.09.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
15.09.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
15.09.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 7
14.04.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 4
27.03.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
27.03.2014 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 18
27.03.2014 Priority document Search / examination 4
10.01.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
10.01.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
10.01.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
03.10.2013 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
03.10.2013 Claims International Searching Authority 2
03.10.2013 Description International Searching Authority 7
03.10.2013 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
03.10.2013 Drawings International Searching Authority 5