blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2897888


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
01.02.2019 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  06.03.2019  [2019/10]
16.10.2018 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
09.10.2018 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
30.04.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
21.07.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.07.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.11.2015 Change - extension states published on  23.12.2015  [2015/52]
26.06.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  29.07.2015  [2015/31]
26.06.2015 Request for examination filed published on  29.07.2015  [2015/31]
19.05.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.04.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
16.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
25.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
19.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
19.09.2014 Amendment by applicant
12.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
28.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
15.10.2013 PCT data prior to European publication