blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2897888
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2897888Global Dossier 29.07.2015A1
Priority number Date
BG11130712 19.09.2012
WO2013BG00042 29.08.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2014043768Global Dossier 27.03.2014A1
Priority number Date
BG11130712 19.09.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
BG111307 31.03.2014A
Priority number Date
BG11130712 19.09.2012