Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2879586

EP2879586 - QUANTIFYING PROBE DEFLECTION FOR IMPROVED CATHETER IDENTIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.10.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.10.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[2019/45]
Former [2015/24]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / BHARAT, Shyam
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 5
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
02 / KUNG, Cynthia Ming-fu
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 5
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
03 / KRUECKER, Jochen
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 5
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
 [2015/24]
Representative(s)Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2019/45]Steffen, Thomas
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Former [2015/24]Steffen, Thomas
Philips International B.V.
Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date13774237.522.07.2013
[2019/45]
WO2013IB56000
Priority number, dateUS201261679696P04.08.2012         Original published format: US 201261679696 P
[2015/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014024069
Date:13.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2879586
Date:10.06.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2014
[2015/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2879586
Date:06.11.2019
Language:EN
[2019/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.02.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61B8/08, A61B8/12, A61N5/10, A61B8/00
[2015/24]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/24]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:QUANTIFIZIERUNG DER SONDENABLENKUNG FÜR VERBESSERTE KATHETERIDENTIFIZIERUNG[2015/24]
English:QUANTIFYING PROBE DEFLECTION FOR IMPROVED CATHETER IDENTIFICATION[2015/24]
French:QUANTIFICATION DE DÉVIATION DE SONDE POUR IDENTIFICATION DE CATHÉTER AMÉLIORÉE[2015/24]
Entry into regional phase04.03.2015National basic fee paid 
04.03.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
04.03.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/24]
23.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.09.2019Fee for grant paid
27.09.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.09.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.05.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
01.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
31.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
31.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2011098926  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-32 * abstract * * figures 1-8 * * page 5, line 3 - page 13, line 16 *;
 [A]US2010030063  (LEE NATHAN TYLER [US], et al) [A] 1-32 * abstract * * figures 1-11 * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0082] *;
 [A]WO2012101563  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-32 * abstract * * figures 1-7 * * page 9, line 13 - page 16, line 18 *