Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2897558

EP2897558 - SHOULDER IMPLANT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.09.2017
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zimmer, Inc.
1800 W. Center Street
Warsaw IN 46580 / US
[2015/31]
Inventor(s)01 / PHIPPS, James P.
20 Timberhill Court
Pacifica, California 94044 / US
 [2015/31]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2016/46]
Former [2015/31]Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London
EC1A 4HD / GB
Application number, filing date13774282.118.09.2013
[2016/46]
WO2013US60371
Priority number, dateUS201261704134P21.09.2012         Original published format: US 201261704134 P
[2015/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014047155
Date:27.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2897558
Date:29.07.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2014
[2015/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2897558
Date:16.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/40
[2015/31]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/31]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHULTERIMPLANTATSYSTEM[2015/31]
English:SHOULDER IMPLANT SYSTEM[2015/31]
French:SYSTÈME D'IMPLANT D'ÉPAULE[2015/31]
Entry into regional phase20.04.2015National basic fee paid 
20.04.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
20.04.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/31]
16.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.05.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.10.2016Fee for grant paid
04.10.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.10.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.05.2016
Opposition(s)17.08.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
13.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU18.09.2013
AT16.11.2016
BE16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
MC16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SI16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
SM16.11.2016
BG16.02.2017
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/29]AT16.11.2016
BE16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
MC16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SI16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
SM16.11.2016
BG16.02.2017
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/52]AT16.11.2016
BE16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SI16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
SM16.11.2016
BG16.02.2017
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/38]AT16.11.2016
BE16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
SM16.11.2016
BG16.02.2017
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/37]AT16.11.2016
BE16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
SM16.11.2016
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/36]AT16.11.2016
BE16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/34]AT16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/33]AT16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/26]AT16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV16.11.2016
Cited inInternational search[X]US2005251263  (FORRER MICHAEL [CH] ET AL) [X] 1-4,8-11,14-17 * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0079] * * paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0107] * * figure 5 *;
 [X]US2004002765  (MARONEY BRIAN [US] ET AL) [X] 1-3,8-10,14-16 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0046] * * figures 1,2,9 *;
 [X]US2005113931  (HORBER WILLI [CH]) [X] 1,2,5,6,8,9,12,14,15 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0045] * * figures 1,6-8 *;
 [X]EP2324800  (BIOMET MFG CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6,8,9,12,14,15,18 * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0049] * * figures 1,5A,5B *
by applicantUS8070820
 US7959680
 US5282861