Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2900707

EP2900707 - CATALYST COMPONENTS FOR THE POLYMERIZATION OF OLEFINS AND CATALYSTS THEREFROM OBTAINED [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.07.2015
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l.
Via Pontaccio 10
20121 Milano / IT
[2018/13]
Former [2018/10]For all designated states
Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l.
Via Pontaccio 10
20127 Milano / IT
Former [2015/32]For all designated states
Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l.
Via Soperga 14/A
20127 Milano / IT
Inventor(s)01 / GUIDOTTI, Simona
c/o Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l.
P.le G. Donegani 12
I-44122 Ferrara / IT
02 / ESPOSITO, Simona
c/o Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l.
P.le G. Donegani 12
I-44122 Ferrara / IT
03 / LIGUORI, Dario
c/o Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l.
P.le G. Donegani 12
I-44122 Ferrara / IT
04 / MORINI, Giampiero
c/o Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l.
P.le G. Donegani 12
I-44122 Ferrara / IT
05 / PIEMONTESI, Fabrizio
c/o Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l.
P.le G. Donegani 12
I-44122 Ferrara / IT
06 / VITALE, Gianni
c/o Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l.
P.le G. Donegani 12
I-44122 Ferrara / IT
 [2015/32]
Representative(s)Giberti, Stefano , et al
Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l.
Intellectual Property
P.le Privato Donegani 12
44122 Ferrara / IT
[2015/32]
Application number, filing date13774374.625.09.2013
WO2013EP69927
Priority number, dateEP2012018610826.09.2012         Original published format: EP 12186108
US201261706708P27.09.2012         Original published format: US 201261706708 P
[2015/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014048964
Date:03.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2900707
Date:05.08.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.2014
[2015/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.04.2014
ClassificationInternational:C08F10/06, C08F4/657, C08F4/651
[2015/32]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/32]
TitleGerman:KATALYSATORKOMPONENTEN ZUR OLEFINPOLYMERISIERUNG UND DARAUS GEWONNENEN KATALYSATOREN[2015/32]
English:CATALYST COMPONENTS FOR THE POLYMERIZATION OF OLEFINS AND CATALYSTS THEREFROM OBTAINED[2015/32]
French:COMPOSANTS POUR CATALYSEUR DE POLYMÉRISATION D'OLÉFINES ET CATALYSEURS OBTENUS À PARTIR DE CEUX-CI[2015/32]
Entry into regional phase10.03.2015National basic fee paid 
10.03.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
10.03.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/32]
10.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
08.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
11.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
11.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1775309  (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]) [X] 1-15 * example 8 * * claim - * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0035] *;
 [X]US4370456  (GEORGE KATHLEEN F) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,12-15 * example - * * claim - *;
 [X]WO2012041944  (BASELL POLIOLEFINE SRL [IT], et al) [X] 1,2,4-9,12-15 * example - * * claim - *
by applicantUS4613655
 CN1631922
 WO2010078494
 US7388061
 US4399054
 US4469648
 EP0395083
 EP0553805
 EP0553806
 EP0601525
 WO9844001
 WO9844009
    - FREGONESE; BRESADOLA, "catalyst system supported on MgCl2 doped with ZnCl2 for olefin polymerization", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR CATALYSIS A: CHEMICAL, (1999), vol. 145, pages 265 - 271
    - Y. INOUE; Y. ITABASHI; R. CHÛJÔ, "Studies of the stereospecific polymerization mechanism of propylene by a modified Ziegler-Natta catalyst based on 125 MHz 13C n.m.r. spectra", POLYMER, (1984), vol. 25, page 1640
    - R. CHÛJÔ; Y. KOGURE; T. VÄÄNÄNEN, "Two-site model analysis of 13C n.m.r. of polypropylene polymerized by Ziegler-Natta catalyst with external alkoxysilane donors", POLYMER, (1994), vol. 35, page 339
    - C. J. CARMAN; R. A. HARRINGTON; C. E. WILKES, "Monomer Sequence Distribution in Ethylene-Propylene Rubber Measured by 13C NMR. 3. Use of Reaction Probability Mode", MACROMOLECULES, (1977), vol. 10, page 536
    - M. KAKUGO; Y. NAITO; K. MIZUNUMA; T. MIYATAKE, "Carbon-13 NMR determination of monomer sequence distribution in ethylene-propylene copolymers prepared with ?-titanium trichloride- diethylaluminum chloride", MACROMOLECULES, (1982), vol. 15, page 1150
    - C.J. CARMAN; R.A. HARRINGTON; C.E. WILKES, "Monomer Sequence Distribution in Ethylene-Propylene Rubber Measured by 13C NMR. 3. Use of Reaction Probability Model", MACROMOLECULES, (1977), vol. 10, page 536