Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2904109

EP2904109 - SEQUENCING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.03.2016
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Base4 Innovation Ltd
Broers Building
J J Thomson Avenue
Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB3 0FA / GB
[2015/33]
Inventor(s)01 / FRAYLING, Cameron Alexander
c/o Base4 Innovation Ltd
Broers Building
JJ Thomson Avenue
Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB3 0FA / GB
02 / BALMFORTH, Barnaby
c/o Base4 Innovation Ltd
Broers Building
JJ Thomson Avenue
Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB3 0FA / GB
03 / SOARES, Bruno Flavio Nogueira de Sousa
c/o Base4 Innovation Ltd
Broers Building
JJ Thomson Avenue
Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB3 0FA / GB
04 / ISAAC, Thomas Henry
c/o Base4 Innovation Ltd
Broers Building
JJ Thomson Avenue
Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB3 0FA / GB
05 / BREINER, Boris
c/o Base4 Innovation Ltd
Broers Building
JJ Thomson Avenue
Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB3 0FA / GB
06 / NATALE, Alessandra
c/o Base4 Innovation Ltd
Broers Building
JJ Thomson Avenue
Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB3 0FA / GB
07 / AMASIO, Michele
c/o Base4 Innovation Ltd
Broers Building
JJ Thomson Avenue
Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB3 0FA / GB
 [2015/33]
Representative(s)Lau, Sarah Jane , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/33]Lau, Sarah Jane , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date13774485.004.10.2013
[2015/33]
WO2013GB52595
Priority number, dateGB2012001777204.10.2012         Original published format: GB 201217772
[2015/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014053854
Date:10.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2904109
Date:12.08.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2014
[2015/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.04.2014
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68
[2015/33]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/33]
TitleGerman:SEQUENZIERUNGSVERFAHREN[2015/33]
English:SEQUENCING METHOD[2015/33]
French:MÉTHODE DE SÉQUENÇAGE[2015/33]
Entry into regional phase24.04.2015National basic fee paid 
24.04.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
24.04.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/33]
09.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.10.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.11.2016
08.11.2016Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
25.11.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination25.01.2017Appeal received No.  T1527/17
23.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)EP17206000.6  / EP3327143
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.11.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
11.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
15.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[IY]US2003138831  (KWAGH JAE-GYU [US], et al) [I] 1-22 * paragraphs [0098] - [0100] * [Y] 1-22;
 [I]US5674743  (ULMER KEVIN M [US]) [I] 1-22 * column 30, line 8 - column 37, line 45; figure 6 *;
 [I]WO8903432  (US ENERGY [US]) [I] 1-22 * page 3, line 27 - page 4, line 27; claims 1-8 *;
 [A]WO2009120372  (PACIFIC BIOSCIENCES CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * paragraph [0009]; figure 2B *
 [I]  - JAMES CLARKE ET AL, "Continuous base identification for single-molecule nanopore DNA sequencing", NATURE NANOTECHNOLOGY, (20090401), vol. 4, no. 4, doi:10.1038/nnano.2009.12, ISSN 1748-3387, pages 265 - 270, XP055028415 [I] 1-22 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nnano.2009.12
 [Y]  - NUTIU R ET AL, "Structure-switching signaling aptamers: transducing molecular recognition into fluorescence signaling", CHEMISTRY - A EUROPEAN JOURNAL, WILEY - V C H VERLAG GMBH & CO. KGAA, WEINHEIM, DE, (20040419), vol. 10, no. 8, doi:10.1002/CHEM.200305470, ISSN 0947-6539, pages 1868 - 1876, XP002374936 [Y] 1-22 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/chem.200305470
 [A]  - YOLANDA SCHAERLI AND FLORIAN HOLLFELDER, "The potential of microfluidic water-in-oil droplets in experimental biology", MOLECULAR BIOSYSTEMS, ROYAL SOCIETY OF CHEMISTRY, GB, vol. 5, no. 12, doi:10.1039/B907578J, ISSN 1742-206X, (20091201), pages 1392 - 1404, (20091012), XP002669720 [A] 1-22 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b907578j