Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2804116

EP2804116 - INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, PROGRAM, AND BOARD MANUFACTURING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/47]INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, PROGRAM, AND SUBSTRATE PRODUCTION SYSTEM
[2018/10]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.02.2019
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.10.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT, SM
published on 20.03.2019  [2019/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Zuken
25-1 Edahigashi 2-chome
Tsuzuki-ku
Yokohama-shi
Kanagawa 224-8585 / JP
[2014/47]
Inventor(s)01 / WATANABE, Yasuyuki
c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA ZUKEN
25-1 Edahigashi 2-chome
Tsuzuki-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 224-8585 / JP
 [2014/47]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[2018/14]
Former [2014/47]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
Application number, filing date13775504.705.02.2013
[2018/14]
WO2013JP00612
Priority number, dateJP2012009043711.04.2012         Original published format: JP 2012090437
[2014/47]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013153720
Date:17.10.2013
Language:JA
[2013/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2804116
Date:19.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2804116
Date:04.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP17.10.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:H05K3/00, G06F17/50, // H05K3/12
[2015/42]
Former International [2014/47]G06F17/50, B05C5/00, H05K3/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/47]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN, PROGRAMM UND SUBSTRATPRODUKTIONSSYSTEM[2014/47]
English:INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, PROGRAM, AND BOARD MANUFACTURING SYSTEM[2018/10]
French:DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROGRAMME, ET SYSTÈME DE PRODUCTION DE SUBSTRAT[2014/47]
Former [2014/47]INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, PROGRAM, AND SUBSTRATE PRODUCTION SYSTEM
Entry into regional phase08.08.2014Translation filed 
14.08.2014National basic fee paid 
14.08.2014Search fee paid 
14.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
14.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/47]
08.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.12.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.09.2017Date of oral proceedings
14.09.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
16.10.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.01.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
25.01.2018Fee for grant paid
25.01.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.08.2016
Opposition(s)07.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
24.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
22.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
26.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL04.04.2018
AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
IT04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
SM04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
[2019/11]
Former [2019/10]AL04.04.2018
AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/09]AL04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/08]AL04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/03]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2018/52]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
Former [2018/51]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/50]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/49]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/47]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/46]AL04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/43]NL04.04.2018
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2009034833  (OZAKI YUKIHISA [JP], et al) [Y] 1-22 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US2010014105  (YUN KWAN-SOO [KR], et al) [Y] 1-22 * paragraphs [0005] - [0008]; figure 2 *
International search[Y]WO2006126457  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP], et al);
 [Y]JP2010033571  (SEIKO EPSON CORP);
 [A]JP2005085877  (SEIKO EPSON CORP);
 [Y]JP2010135499  (SEIKO EPSON CORP);
 [Y]JP2007152167  (SEIKO EPSON CORP);
 [A]JP2001142565  (SONY CORP);
 [Y]JPH11184064  (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD);
 [Y]JP2008242885  (FUJIFILM CORP);
 [Y]JPH10177589  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP)
 [Y]  - ATSUSHI USHIRODA ET AL., "High quality imaging by new dithering method and its evaluation", ITE TECHNICAL REPORT, THE INSTITUTE OF IMAGE INFORMATION AND TELEVISION ENGINEERS, (19971017), vol. 21, no. 59, pages 25 - 30, XP008174570
ExaminationKR20080108844
by applicantJP2009255007