blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2804116 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2804116



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 467
08.02.2019 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
16.04.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
08.03.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
02.02.2018 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 2
30.01.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
18.01.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
18.01.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 7
18.01.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
16.10.2017 Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
16.10.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
16.10.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
16.10.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
16.10.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 42
16.10.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 42
14.09.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
14.09.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
14.09.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
14.09.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
14.09.2017 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
16.08.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
16.08.2017 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 2
10.08.2017 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
10.08.2017 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
31.07.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
31.07.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
31.07.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
31.07.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
31.07.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
31.07.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
31.07.2017 Claims Search / examination 7
31.07.2017 Claims Search / examination 7
31.07.2017 Claims Search / examination 7
31.07.2017 Claims Search / examination 7
31.07.2017 Claims Search / examination 7
31.07.2017 Description Search / examination 1
31.07.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 21
08.05.2017 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
13.04.2017 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
13.04.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 2
04.04.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
04.04.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
04.04.2017 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
04.04.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 2
12.12.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
12.12.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
12.12.2016 Claims Search / examination 6
12.12.2016 Description Search / examination 2
12.12.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
05.08.2016 Annex to a communication Search / examination 6
05.08.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
05.08.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
25.07.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
08.04.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
08.04.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 7
08.04.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 7
08.04.2016 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
29.09.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
11.09.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
11.09.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 4
11.09.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
31.08.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
06.03.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 7
06.03.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 8
06.03.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
06.03.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
14.11.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
29.10.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
29.10.2014 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 10
22.10.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
09.09.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
04.09.2014 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
22.08.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
14.08.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
08.08.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
08.08.2014 Claims Search / examination 7
08.08.2014 Description Search / examination 24
08.08.2014 Drawings Search / examination 11
08.08.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
08.08.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 8
08.08.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
05.11.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 28
17.10.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
17.10.2013 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
17.10.2013 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 31