blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2804116
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9173296Global Dossier 27.10.2015B2
US2014351786 27.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
JP2012090437 11.04.2012
WO2013JP00612 05.02.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101598525BGlobal Dossier 29.02.2016B1
KR20140110081 16.09.2014A
Priority number Date
JP2012090437 11.04.2012
WO2013JP00612 05.02.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2804116Global Dossier 04.04.2018B1
EP2804116 14.10.2015A4
EP2804116 19.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
JP2012090437 11.04.2012
WO2013JP00612 05.02.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013153720Global Dossier 17.10.2013A1
Priority number Date
JP2012090437 11.04.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP5907788BGlobal Dossier 26.04.2016B2
JP2013219283 24.10.2013A
Priority number Date
JP2012090437 11.04.2012