EP2836973 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR FULLFILLING ORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.06.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2017 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leigo NFC Holdings Pty Ltd 20 George Street Suite 4 Level 3 Hornsby, New South Wales 2077 / AU | [2015/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEIGO, Robert c/o Suite 4 Level 3 20 George Street Hornsby, New South Wales 2077 / AU | [2015/08] | Representative(s) | Hamilton, Alistair AHIP 17 Castle Street Kirkcudbright DG6 4JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/08] | Hamilton, Alistair AHIP Ty Eurgain Cefn Eurgain Lane Rhosesmor Mold, Flintshire CH7 6PG / GB | Application number, filing date | 13775722.5 | 09.04.2013 | WO2013AU00363 | Priority number, date | AU20120901387 | 10.04.2012 Original published format: AU 2012901387 | [2015/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013152388 | Date: | 17.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2836973 | Date: | 18.02.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 17.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/00, G06Q50/00, G06Q30/06, G06Q20/32, G06Q20/20, G06Q20/12 | [2015/15] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0635 (EP,US);
G06Q20/12 (EP,US);
G06Q20/20 (EP,US);
G06Q20/32 (US);
G06Q20/3278 (EP,US);
G06Q30/00 (EP,US);
G06Q30/06 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0601 (EP,US);
G06Q50/01 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/08] | G06Q30/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR AUFTRAGSERFÜLLUNG | [2015/08] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR FULLFILLING ORDERS | [2015/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES D'EXÉCUTION DE COMMANDES | [2015/08] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2014 | Search fee paid | 07.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 07.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/08] | 25.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/27] | 21.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.07.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2011258058 (CARROLL ROGER D [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2012027748 (VIVOTECH INC [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [X]US2012072311 (KHAN MOHAMMAD [US]) [X] 1-9* the whole document * | International search | [X]US2007073586 (DEV ROGER [US], et al); | [X]WO2011057106 (LINE MONKEY INC [US], et al) |