Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2809936

EP2809936 - GAS TURBINE ENGINE WITH IMPROVED FUEL EFFICIENCY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.02.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 14.08.2019  [2019/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
United Technologies Corporation
10 Farm Springs Road
Farmington, CT 06032 / US
[2016/43]
Former [2014/50]For all designated states
United Technologies Corporation
One Financial Plaza
Hartford, CT 06101 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HASEL, Karl L.
201 Shallowbrook Lane
Manchester, Connecticut 06040 / US
02 / SMITH, Peter G.
5 Kovacs Place
Wallingford, Connecticut 06492 / US
03 / OCHS, Stuart S.
39 Buckland Street
1032-2
Manchester, Connecticut 06040 / US
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[2019/33]
Former [2014/50]Hull, James Edward
Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date13775841.317.01.2013
[2019/33]
WO2013US21831
Priority number, dateUS20121336198731.01.2012         Original published format: US201213361987
[2014/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013154639
Date:17.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/42]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2809936
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2013
[2014/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2809936
Date:14.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US03.01.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:F02K3/02
[2014/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:GASTURBINENMOTOR MIT ERHÖHTER KRAFTSTOFFEFFIZIENZ[2014/50]
English:GAS TURBINE ENGINE WITH IMPROVED FUEL EFFICIENCY[2014/50]
French:TURBINE À GAZ DOTÉE D'UNE EFFICIENCE ÉNERGÉTIQUE AMÉLIORÉE[2014/50]
Entry into regional phase19.08.2014National basic fee paid 
19.08.2014Search fee paid 
19.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
19.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
29.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.08.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.07.2019Fee for grant paid
05.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.03.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
28.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
24.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
24.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
24.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2011120078  (SCHWARK JR FRED W [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0022]; figure 1 * [Y] 15;
 [E]EP2798183  (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [E] 1-15 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0043]; figures 1,3 *;
 [Y]US5259187  (DUNBAR DONALD K [US], et al) [Y] 15 * column 1, line 43 - line 50 * * column 3, line 47 - line 57; figures 1,2 *
International search[X]US2002098082  (ITO ET AL.);
 [X]  - "GEARS PUT A NEW SPIN ON TURBOFAN PERFORMANCE", MACHINE DESIGN MAGAZINE, (19981105), XP055129882
by applicantUS2011120078
 US5259187