Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2804756

EP2804756 - HIGH DENSITY UNIDIRECTIONAL FABRIC FOR SOFT BALLISTICS APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  31.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.12.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.01.2018  [2018/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Barrday, Inc.
75 Moorefield Street
Cambridge, Ontario N1R 5W6 / CA
For all designated states
Teijin Aramid B.V.
Velperweg 76
P.O. Box 5153
6802 ED Arnhem / NL
[2014/48]
Inventor(s)01 / VAN HEERDEN, Jason
54 Harris Street
Cambridge, Ontario N1R 8M9 / CA
02 / MACNEIL, Jonathan
5126 East Liberty Hill Road
York, South Carolina 29745 / US
03 / PATEL, Chinkal
51 Camp Drive
Ancaster, Ontario L9K 0A5 / CA
04 / TOWERY, Matt
1323F Corton Drive
Charlotte, North Carolina 28203 / US
05 / WILSON, Jason
8926 Glade Court
Huntersville, North Carolina 28078 / US
06 / DE HAAS, Marc-Jan
Kinkelenburg 1
NL-7339 DJ Apeldoorn / NL
 [2014/48]
Representative(s)CPW GmbH
Kasinostraße 19-21
42103 Wuppertal / DE
[2014/48]
Application number, filing date13776344.717.01.2013
WO2013US21905
Priority number, dateUS201261587310P17.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261587310 P
[2014/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013154643
Date:17.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2804756
Date:26.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2013
[2014/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US17.10.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:B32B27/00, B32B5/22, B32B5/24, B32B5/26
[2015/28]
Former International [2014/48]B32B27/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/48]
TitleGerman:HOCHDICHTES UNIDIREKTIONALES GEWEBE FÜR WEICHE BALLISTIKANWENDUNGEN[2014/48]
English:HIGH DENSITY UNIDIRECTIONAL FABRIC FOR SOFT BALLISTICS APPLICATIONS[2014/48]
French:TISSU UNIDIRECTIONNEL À HAUTE DENSITÉ POUR APPLICATIONS DE BALISTIQUE SOUPLE[2014/48]
Entry into regional phase18.08.2014National basic fee paid 
18.08.2014Search fee paid 
18.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
18.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/48]
22.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.08.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/01]
29.08.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2018/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
25.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201705   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP1951510  (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [Y] 1-15 * example 2 * * paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraphs [0023] , [0032] * * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO03053676  (DU PONT [US]) [Y] 1-15 * claim 6 * * page 17, lines 10-15 * * the whole document *
International search[Y]US2008268733  (PRITCHARD ET AL);
 [Y]US2008064280  (BHATNAGAR ET AL);
 [Y]US2010122517  (SIMMELINK ET AL);
 [A]US2010239810  (BHATNAGAR ET AL)