Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2804756 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2804756



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 84
13.12.2017 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
30.11.2017 Closing of application Search / examination 1
29.08.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
07.03.2017 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
22.12.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.12.2015 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 3
25.06.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
08.06.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
08.06.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 3
08.06.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
28.05.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
29.10.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
24.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
21.10.2014 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Search / examination 1
16.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.10.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.10.2014 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
16.10.2014 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
08.10.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
25.09.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
28.08.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
26.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
26.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
26.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
26.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
26.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
26.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.08.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
09.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
09.07.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
09.07.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
12.06.2014 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
12.06.2014 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
12.06.2014 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
12.06.2014 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
12.06.2014 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
12.06.2014 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
08.11.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 11
17.10.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
17.10.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 15