Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2804756


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
01.12.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  03.01.2018  [2018/01]
31.08.2017 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
08.03.2017 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
30.01.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.12.2015 Amendment by applicant
05.06.2015 Change - classification published on  08.07.2015  [2015/28]
05.06.2015 Change - classification published on  08.07.2015  [2015/28]
05.06.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  08.07.2015  [2015/28]
20.03.2015 Change - extension states published on  22.04.2015  [2015/17]
21.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
24.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
21.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
21.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
13.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
11.07.2014 Amendment by applicant
10.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
13.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
01.11.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
19.10.2013 PCT data prior to European publication