Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2879748

EP2879748 - AN APPARATUS FOR SUPPORTING AN AIRWAY OF A SUBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/24]AN APPARATUS AND A METHOD FOR SUPPORTING AN AIRWAY OF A SUBJECT
[2016/13]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.01.2017
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip13.01.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.02.2017  [2017/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2015/24]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / SHEN, Meng
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 5
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
02 / JIN, Sheng
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 5
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
03 / GONG, Han Yan
c/oHigh Tech Campus
Building 5
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
04 / JIN, Hua
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 5
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
05 / WU, Jianliang
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 5
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
 [2015/24]
Representative(s)Steffen, Thomas
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2015/24]Steffen, Thomas
Philips International B.V.
Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date13776856.031.07.2013
WO2013IB56284
Priority number, dateWO2012CN7962103.08.2012         Original published format: PCT/CN2012/079621
[2015/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014020552
Date:06.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2879748
Date:10.06.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2014
[2015/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.02.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61M16/20
[2015/24]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/24]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG EINES ATEMWEGS EINER PERSON[2016/13]
English:AN APPARATUS FOR SUPPORTING AN AIRWAY OF A SUBJECT[2016/13]
French:APPAREIL D'ASSISTANCE POUR LES VOIES AÉRIENNES CHEZ UN SUJET[2016/13]
Former [2015/24]VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG EINES ATEMWEGS EINER PERSON
Former [2015/24]AN APPARATUS AND A METHOD FOR SUPPORTING AN AIRWAY OF A SUBJECT
Former [2015/24]APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ D'ASSISTANCE POUR LES VOIES AÉRIENNES CHEZ UN SUJET
Entry into regional phase03.03.2015National basic fee paid 
03.03.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
03.03.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/24]
13.08.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.04.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.08.2016Fee for grant paid
22.08.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.08.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/07]
30.09.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2017/07]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.04.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
01.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[I]WO2010076711  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [I] 1,2,4-8 * page 12, paragraph 2 - page 15, paragraph 1 * * page 20, paragraph 3 - page 22, paragraph 2 * * figures 4,6 *;
 [A]WO2010141983  (RESMED PARIS SAS [FR], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0147] - [0148] *;
 [A]US2009194109  (DOSHI RAJIV [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0017] *;
 [A]US2011253147  (GUSKY MICHAEL H [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0048] - [0049] *
by applicantWO2010076704