Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2906712

EP2906712 - METHODS AND MEANS FOR PREDICTING RESISTANCE TO ANTI-CANCER TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.04.2017
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.04.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.05.2017  [2017/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Stichting Het Nederlands Kanker Instituut- Antoni van Leeuwenhoek Ziekenhuis
Plesmanlaan 121
1066 CX Amsterdam / NL
For all designated states
Agendia N.V.
Science Park 406
1098 XH Amsterdam / NL
[2015/34]
Inventor(s)01 / BERNARDS, Rene
c/o Plesmanlaan 121
NL-1066 CX Amsterdam / NL
02 / ROEPMAN, Paul
c/o Science Park 406
NL-1098 XH Amsterdam / NL
03 / HUANG, Sidong
c/o Plesmanlaan 121
NL-1066 CX Amsterdam / NL
 [2015/34]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2015/34]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date13777164.810.10.2013
[2015/34]
WO2013NL50720
Priority number, dateEP2012018803710.10.2012         Original published format: EP 12188037
[2015/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014058317
Date:17.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2906712
Date:19.08.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2014
[2015/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.04.2014
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68
[2015/34]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/34]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND MITTEL ZUR VORHERSAGE DER RESISTENZ GEGEN EINE KREBSBEHANDLUNG[2015/34]
English:METHODS AND MEANS FOR PREDICTING RESISTANCE TO ANTI-CANCER TREATMENT[2015/34]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET MOYENS DE PRÉDICTION DE RÉSISTANCE À UN TRAITEMENT ANTI-CANCER[2015/34]
Entry into regional phase11.05.2015National basic fee paid 
11.05.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
11.05.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/34]
10.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.12.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/21]
18.01.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/21]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.06.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2012074904  (PRECISION THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * figures 2-4, 6, 7; example 1; claims 1, 29 *;
 [A]US2006029944  (HUANG FEI [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2008131885  (PRATILAS CHRISTINE [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [AP]WO2012138783  (NETHERLANDS CANCER INST [NL], et al) [AP] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [T]  - SIDONG HUANG ET AL, "MED12 Controls the Response to Multiple Cancer Drugs through Regulation of TGF-[beta] Receptor Signaling", CELL, (20121101), vol. 151, no. 5, doi:10.1016/j.cell.2012.10.035, ISSN 0092-8674, pages 937 - 950, XP055050748 [T] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2012.10.035
by applicantUS6204375
 DE10021390
 WO2004083369
 US7138226
 WO2008039071
 WO2005028517
 WO2004081009
 WO2004112710
 WO02062793
 WO2005039570
 WO2004056352
 JPH08333249
 WO2005019422
 WO9948904
    - MAEMONDO ET AL., N ENGL J MED, (2010), vol. 362, pages 2380 - 2388
    - GORRE ET AL., SCIENCE, (2001), vol. 293, pages 876 - 880
    - SHAH ET AL., CANCER CELL, (2002), vol. 2, pages 117 - 125
    - CHAPMAN ET AL., N ENGL J MED, (2011), vol. 364, pages 2507 - 2516
    - KWAK ET AL., N ENGL J MED, (2010), vol. 363, pages 1693 - 1703
    - SEQUIST ET AL., SCIENCE TRANSL MED, (2011), vol. 3, page 75RA26
    - DAUB ET AL., NAT REV DRUG DISCOV, (2004), vol. 3, pages 1001 - 1010
    - YUN ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2008), vol. 105, pages 2070 - 2075
    - SCIENCE, vol. 293, pages 876 - 880
    - CHOI ET AL., N ENGL J MED, (2010), vol. 363, pages 1734 - 1739
    - KATAYAMA ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2011), vol. 108, pages 7535 - 7540
    - AMADO ET AL., J CLIN ONCOL, (2008), vol. 26, pages 1626 - 1634
    - KARAPETIS ET AL., N ENGL J MED, (2008), vol. 359, pages 1757 - 1765
    - WAGLE ET AL., J CLIN ONCOL, (2011), vol. 29, pages 3085 - 3096
    - JOHANNESSEN ET AL., NATURE, (2010), vol. 468, pages 968 - 972
    - CONAWAY ET AL., TIBS, (2005), vol. 30, pages 250 - 255
    - FIRESTEIN ET AL., NATURE, (2008), vol. 455, pages 547 - 551
    - ZHANG, CELL RESEARCH, (2009), vol. 19, pages 128 - 139
    - ELDERING ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (2003), vol. 31, page E153
    - MARTIN-MAGNIETTE ET AL., BIOINFORMATICS, (2005), vol. 21, pages 1995 - 2000
    - YANG ET AL., NUCL ACIDS RES, (2002), vol. 30, page 15
    - FAN ET AL., CONF PROC IEEE ENG MED BIOL SOC., (2005), vol. 5, pages 4810 - 3
    - VAN 'T VEER ET AL., NATURE, (2002), vol. 415, pages 484 - 5
    - PENG ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (2005), vol. 44, pages 2293 - 2304
    - KANASAKI ET AL., J. AM. SOC. NEPHROL, (2003), vol. 14, pages 863 - 872
    - HUANG ET AL., CANCER CELL, (2009), vol. 15, pages 328 - 340
    - BRUMMELKAMP ET AL., SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 296, pages 550 - 553
    - BRUMMELKAMP ET AL., NAT CHEM BIOL, (2006), vol. 2, pages 202 - 206
    - HOLZEL ET AL., CELL, (2010), vol. 142, pages 218 - 229
    - MCDERMOTT ET AL., CANCER RES, (2008), vol. 68, pages 3389 - 3395
    - BERNS ET AL., NATURE, (2004), vol. 428, pages 431 - 437
    - PAO; CHMIELECKI, NATURE REVIEWS, (2010), vol. 10, pages 760 - 774
    - MANNING ET AL., SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 298, pages 1912 - 1934
    - ZHANG, CELL RES, (2009), vol. 19, pages 128 - 139
    - THIERY ET AL., CELL, (2009), vol. 139, pages 871 - 890
    - KORTLEVER ET AL., NAT CELL BIOL, (2006), vol. 8, pages 877 - 884
    - KIM ET AL., BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, (2012), vol. 445, pages 403 - 411
    - MAAK; 2012 ET AL., ANN SUR.
    - SALAZAR ET AL., J CLIN ONCOL, (2011), vol. 29, pages 17 - 24
    - WANG ET AL., BIOINFORMATICS, (2010), vol. 26, pages 136 - 138
    - JORISSEN ET AL., CLIN CANCER RES, (2009), vol. 15, pages 7642 - 7651
    - SMITH ET AL., GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2010), vol. 138, pages 958 - 968
    - BARRETT ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (2011), vol. 39, pages D1005 - 1010
    - GAUTIER ET AL., BIOINFORMATICS, (2004), vol. 20, pages 307 - 315
    - GENTLEMAN ET AL., GENOME BIOL, (2004), vol. 5, page R80
    - GARNETT ET AL., NATURE, (2012), vol. 483, pages 570 - 575
    - URAMOTO ET AL., LUNG CANCER, (2011), vol. 73, pages 361 - 365
    - BIBIKOVA ET AL., AM J PATHOL, (2004), vol. 165, pages 1799 - 1807
    - FAN ET AL., GENOME RESEARCH, (2004), vol. 14, pages 878 - 885
    - MITTEMPERGHER ET AL., PLOS ONE, (2011), vol. 6, page E17163
    - IWAMOTO ET AL., J CLIN ONCOL., (20120301), vol. 30, no. 7, pages 729 - 34