Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2840788

EP2840788 - Video decoding apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/09]IMAGE INFORMATION DECODING METHOD, IMAGE DECODING METHOD, AND DEVICE USING SAME
[2019/11]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.03.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 14.08.2019  [2019/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Electronics and Telecommunications Research Institute
161 Gajeong-dong
Yuseong-gu
Daejeon-si 305-700 / KR
[2019/33]
Former [2015/09]For all designated states
Electronics And Telecommunications Research Institute
161 Gajeong-dong Yuseong-gu
Daejeon-si 305-700 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / KANG, Jung Won
609-501 Unam Neomia
Gwanpyeong-dong
Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 305-746 / KR
02 / LEE, Ha Hyun
136-5 Myeonmok 2-dong
Jungnang-gu
Seoul 131-819 / KR
03 / CHOI, Jin Soo
609-1605 Banseokmaeul 6 Danji Apt.
613 Banseok-dong
Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 305-750 / KR
04 / KIM, Jin Woong
305-1603 Expo Apt.
Jeonmin-dong
Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 305-761 / KR
 [2015/09]
Representative(s)Peterreins Schley
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Hermann-Sack-Strasse 3
80331 München / DE
[2019/33]
Former [2015/09]Betten & Resch
Theatinerstrasse 8
80333 München / DE
Application number, filing date13777676.116.04.2013
[2019/33]
WO2013KR03204
Priority number, dateKR2012003887016.04.2012         Original published format: KR 20120038870
KR2012006660621.06.2012         Original published format: KR 20120066606
KR2012006792525.06.2012         Original published format: KR 20120067925
KR2012007193302.07.2012         Original published format: KR 20120071933
KR2012007701216.07.2012         Original published format: KR 20120077012
KR2012010892528.09.2012         Original published format: KR 20120108925
KR2012011259810.10.2012         Original published format: KR 20120112598
[2015/09]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013157826
Date:24.10.2013
Language:KO
[2013/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2840788
Date:25.02.2015
Language:EN
[2015/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2840788
Date:14.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR24.10.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04N19/70, H04N19/61, H04N19/187, H04N19/31, H04N19/46, H04N19/30, H04N19/169
[2019/11]
Former International [2016/27]H04N19/70, H04N19/61, H04N19/187, H04N19/31, H04N19/46, H04N19/30
Former International [2016/08]H04N19/70, H04N19/61, H04N19/187, H04N19/31
Former International [2015/09]H04N7/26
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/09]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Videodecodierungsvorrichtung[2019/11]
English:Video decoding apparatus[2019/11]
French:Dispositif de décodage de données vidéo[2019/11]
Former [2015/09]BILDINFORMATIONSDECODIERUNGSVERFAHREN, BILDDECODIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG DAMIT
Former [2015/09]IMAGE INFORMATION DECODING METHOD, IMAGE DECODING METHOD, AND DEVICE USING SAME
Former [2015/09]PROCÉDÉ DE DÉCODAGE DE DONNÉES D'IMAGE, PROCÉDÉ DE DÉCODAGE D'IMAGE ET DISPOSITIF UTILISANT CES PROCÉDÉS
Entry into regional phase10.10.2014Translation filed 
17.11.2014National basic fee paid 
17.11.2014Search fee paid 
17.11.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
17.11.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.11.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR
17.11.2014Examination requested  [2015/09]
03.01.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.01.2019Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.01.2019
22.01.2019Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
06.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.07.2019Fee for grant paid
04.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP16163783.0  / EP3086556
EP19183291.4
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.02.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
30.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
29.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XAI]WO2006134110  (THOMSON LICENSING [FR], et al) [X] 1,10 * abstract * * page 5, line 12 - page 7, line 27 * [A] 3,12 [I] 2,11;
 [XA]US2010098157  (YANG JEONG HYU [KR]) [X] 1,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0061] * [A] 2,3,11,12;
 [XAI]KR20080007086  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1,4,10,13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0030] - [0033] * [A] 3,12 [I] 2,11;
 [A]US2009097573  (CHOI WOONG-IL [KR], et al) [A] 1-4,10-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0013] *;
 [A]KR20110019955  (SK TELECOM CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-4,10-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0012] *;
 [E]WO2014162739  (SHARP KK [JP]) [E] 4,13 * abstract * * page 11, line 24 - line 27 *
 [XAI]  - R. SJOBERG ET AL, "Overview of HEVC high-level syntax and reference picture management", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, (20120101), doi:10.1109/TCSVT.2012.2223052, ISSN 1051-8215, pages 1 - 1, XP055045360 [X] 1,10 * section "II. NAL UNIT HEADER" * * section "VI. REFERENCE PICTURE SETS", subsection "B. Background" * [A] 3,12 [I] 2,11

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCSVT.2012.2223052
 [A]  - FENG ET AL, "A scalable video codec for layered video streaming", REAL-TIME IMAGING, ACADEMIC PRESS LIMITED, GB, (20041001), vol. 10, no. 5, doi:10.1016/J.RTI.2004.08.005, ISSN 1077-2014, pages 297 - 305, XP005001629 [A] 1-3,10-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.rti.2004.08.005
 [A]  - ARGYRIOU A ET AL, "Streaming H.264/AVC video over the Internet", CONSUMER COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKING CONFERENCE, 2004. CCNC 2004. FI RST IEEE LAS VEGAS, NV, USA 5-8 JAN. 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20040105), doi:10.1109/CCNC.2004.1286853, ISBN 978-0-7803-8145-2, pages 169 - 174, XP032165202 [A] 1-4,10-13 * section II.B. "The H.264/AVC Video Coding Standard" *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CCNC.2004.1286853
International search[A]KR100763196B  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.);
 [A]KR20090079932  (NOKIA CORP [FI]);
 [A]KR20060122664  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]);
 [A]WO2011052215  (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al);
 [A]KR20060068254  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR])
ExaminationWO2007042914
 WO2012122176