Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2807556

EP2807556 - APPLICATION INSTALLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  11.11.2016
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.11.2016Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 14.12.2016  [2016/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, New York 10504 / US
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / LEMING, Matthew, William
IBM United Kingdom Limited
MP 211
Hursley Park
Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
02 / WARD, Timothy, James
IBM United Kingdom Limited
Hursley Park
Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
03 / ELLIS, Richard, Raymond
IBM United Kingdom Limited
MP 211
Hursley Park
Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Graham, Timothy Abbey
IBM United Kingdom Limited
Intellectual Property Law
Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
[2014/49]
Application number, filing date13779073.906.03.2013
WO2013IB51765
Priority number, dateGB2012000682418.04.2012         Original published format: GB 201206824
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013156877
Date:24.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2807556
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.2013
[2014/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN24.10.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.01.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/44, G06F9/445
[2015/08]
Former International [2014/49]G06F9/445
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
TitleGerman:ANWENDUNGSINSTALLATIONSSYSTEM[2014/49]
English:APPLICATION INSTALLATION[2014/49]
French:INSTALLATION D'APPLICATION[2014/49]
Entry into regional phase29.08.2014National basic fee paid 
29.08.2014Search fee paid 
29.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
29.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
31.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.11.2016Application withdrawn by applicant  [2016/50]
03.11.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.11.2016
07.11.2016Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.11.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
17.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2003163807  (DRAKE DANIEL R [US] ET AL) [X] 1,4-6,9-12 * paragraphs [0014] , [0022] , [0024] , [0077] , [0109] * * paragraphs [0071] , [0072] * [I] 2,3,7,8;
 [X]US2010257520  (NAVARRO LUIS A [US]) [X] 1-12 * paragraph [0053] *
International search[A]US2010017503  (KIM, H. S. ET AL.);
 [A]US2007234349  (USHIKU, T);
 [A]US2007088799  (LUFT, D. A. ET AL.)