EP2898331 - METHOD FOR MEASURING SURFACE POTENTIALS ON POLARISED DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2016 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Université de Reims Champagne Ardenne (U.R.C.A.) Villa Douce 9 boulevard de La Paix 51100 Reims / FR | [2015/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIRAUDET, Louis 1 rue de Savoye F-51000 Reims / FR | 02 /
BERCU, Nicolae Bogdan 25 rue Ponsardin F-51000 Reims / FR | 03 /
SIMONETTI, Olivier U.F.R. Sciences Exactes et Naturelles Moulin de la Housse - BP 1039 F-51687 Reims Cedex 2 / FR | 04 /
NICOLAS, Jean-Louis U.F.R. Sciences Exactes et Naturelles Moulin de la Housse - BP 1039 F-51687 Reims Cedex 2 / FR | 05 /
MOLINARI, Michaël U.F.R. Sciences Exactes et Naturelles Moulin de la Housse - BP 1039 F-51687 Reims Cedex 2 / FR | [2015/31] | Representative(s) | Rhein, Alain Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon 4A, rue de l'Industrie 67450 Mundolsheim / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/31] | Rhein, Alain Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon 4A rue de l'Industrie 67450 Mundolsheim / FR | Application number, filing date | 13779256.0 | 18.09.2013 | WO2013FR52140 | Priority number, date | FR20120058747 | 18.09.2012 Original published format: FR 1258747 | [2015/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014044966 | Date: | 27.03.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2898331 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01Q60/30 | [2015/31] | CPC: |
G01Q60/30 (EP,US);
G01Q30/20 (US);
G01B11/30 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG DER OBERFLÄCHENPOTENZIALE AUF POLARISIERTEN VORRICHTUNGEN | [2015/31] | English: | METHOD FOR MEASURING SURFACE POTENTIALS ON POLARISED DEVICES | [2015/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA MESURE DE POTENTIELS DE SURFACE SUR DES DISPOSITIFS POLARISÉS | [2015/31] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/31] | 24.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/21] | 08.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2016/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US5907096 (CHEN DONG [US]) [Y] 1,2 * figures 1-6 * * column 6, line 30 - column 13, line 35 * [A] 3-5; | [XY]WO2011098720 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR], et al) [X] 3-5 * figure 1 * * page 9, line 24 - page 19, line 10 * [Y] 1,2; | [A] - LUNA M ET AL, "A study of the topographic and electrical properties of self-assembled islands of alkylsilanes on mica using a combination of non-contact force microscopy techniques", NANOTECHNOLOGY, IOP, BRISTOL, GB, (20060414), vol. 17, no. 7, doi:10.1088/0957-4484/17/7/S13, ISSN 0957-4484, pages S178 - S184, XP020104633 [A] 1-5 * figure 1c * * paragraph [2.2.3] * * paragraph [0003] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0957-4484/17/7/S13 | by applicant | JP2002214113 |