Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2906367

EP2906367 - DEVICE FOR FACILITATING SORTING OF OBJECTS INTO A SORTING RACK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/34]METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ASSISTING IN THE SORTING OF OBJECTS IN A SORTING BOX
[2016/21]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.03.2018
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.04.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.02.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Solystic
152-160 avenue Aristide Briand
92220 Bagneux / FR
[2015/34]
Inventor(s)01 / MIETTE, Emmanuel
10 avenue Catinat
95210 Saint-Gratien / FR
02 / GUIGNARD, Céline
10 rue Henri Tariel
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
03 / VOLTA, Bruno
38 allée de la Clairière
91190 Gif-sur-Yvette / FR
 [2017/20]
Former [2015/34]01 / MIETTE, Emmanuel
10 avenue Catinat
F-95210 Saint Gratien / FR
02 / GUIGNARD, Céline
10 rue Henri Tariel
F-92130 Issy les Moulineaux / FR
03 / VOLTA, Bruno
38 allée de la Clairière
F-91190 Gif sur Yvette / FR
Representative(s)Prugneau, Philippe
Cabinet Prugneau-Schaub 3 avenue Doyen Louis Weil Le Grenat - EUROPOLE
38000 Grenoble / FR
[2015/34]
Application number, filing date13779297.425.09.2013
[2015/34]
WO2013FR52252
Priority number, dateFR2012005971011.10.2012         Original published format: FR 1259710
[2015/34]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014057185
Date:17.04.2014
Language:FR
[2014/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2906367
Date:19.08.2015
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2014
[2015/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2906367
Date:17.05.2017
Language:FR
[2017/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.04.2014
ClassificationInternational:B07C7/00
[2015/34]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/34]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG DER SORTIERUNG VON GEGENSTÄNDEN IN EIN ABLAGEFACH[2017/10]
English:DEVICE FOR FACILITATING SORTING OF OBJECTS INTO A SORTING RACK[2017/10]
French:DISPOSITIF D'AIDE POUR TRIER DES OBJETS DANS UN CASIER DE TRI[2017/10]
Former [2015/34]VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG BEI DER SORTIERUNG VON OBJEKTEN IN EINEM SORTIERBEHÄLTER
Former [2015/34]METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ASSISTING IN THE SORTING OF OBJECTS IN A SORTING BOX
Former [2015/34]PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'AIDE POUR TRIER DES OBJETS DANS UN CASIER DE TRI
Entry into regional phase11.05.2015National basic fee paid 
11.05.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
11.05.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/34]
18.05.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.07.2016Observations by third parties
22.08.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
23.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.12.2016Observations by third parties
22.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.04.2017Fee for grant paid
06.04.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.04.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.05.2016
Opposition(s)20.02.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.09.2013
CY17.05.2017
CZ17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
MC17.05.2017
MK17.05.2017
MT17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SI17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
IE25.09.2017
LU25.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
[2019/51]
Former [2019/47]HU25.09.2013
CY17.05.2017
CZ17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
MC17.05.2017
MT17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SI17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
IE25.09.2017
LU25.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
Former [2019/31]HU25.09.2013
CZ17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
MC17.05.2017
MT17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SI17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
IE25.09.2017
LU25.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
Former [2018/43]CZ17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
MC17.05.2017
MT17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SI17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
IE25.09.2017
LU25.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
Former [2018/34]CZ17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
MC17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SI17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
IE25.09.2017
LU25.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
Former [2018/30]CZ17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
MC17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SI17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
LU25.09.2017
Former [2018/25]CZ17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SI17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2018/11]CZ17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2018/10]CZ17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2018/09]EE17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2017/50]HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2017/49]HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Cited inInternational search[A]US5794789  (PAYSON WILLIAM H [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 13, line 61 - column 16, line 17; figure - *;
 [A]DE3731589  (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * figure 3 *
by applicantUS5794789
 WO2004009257
 US2006022824
 EP0928641
 WO2010089785
 DE102005032533
 US5881890
otherUS6370446
 US6748294
 US5794789
 EP2906367
    - Notta Systems, "Guided Manual Sorting", Postal technology International, (20120900), page 00, XP055289933
    - Matthias Kreidler, "Vorstufe zur Digitalisierung von Briefen", Postbranche Pressemitteilung, (20120508), URL: http://www.postbranche.de/2012/05/08/vorstufe-zur-digitalisierung-von-briefen/, XP055289960
    - CodX, "Private Postdienstleister: Vernetzung ist Thema Nummer 1", POSTMASTER Magazin, (20120000), no. 6, pages 58 - 59, XP055289965
    - Kolster, "Kolster Devices", CodX PostOffice Anwnderforum, (20120502), page 1