Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2882747

EP2882747 - BICYCLIC HETEROARYL CYCLOALKYLDIAMINE DERIVATIVES AS INHIBITORS OF SPLEEN TYROSINE KINASES (SYK) [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.03.2017
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Novartis Tiergesundheit AG
Werk Rosental
Schwarzwaldallee 215
WRO-1032
4058 Basel / CH
[2016/26]
Former [2015/25]For all designated states
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / THOMA, Gebhard
Novartis Pharma AG
Postfach
4002 Basel / CH
02 / BUEHLMAYER, Peter
Hangstrasse 18
4144 Arlesheim / CH
03 / VAN EIS, Maurice
Novartis Pharma AG
Postfach
4002 Basel / CH
04 / SMITH, Alexander Baxter
Novartis Pharma AG
Postfach
4002 Basel / CH
 [2015/25]
Representative(s)Bassinder, Emma Marie , et al
Eli Lilly and Company Limited
European Patent Operations
Erl Wood Manor
Sunninghill Road
Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/25]von Sprecher, Georg
Novartis Pharma AG
Patent Department
4002 Basel / CH
Application number, filing date13779364.212.08.2013
[2016/17]
WO2013IB56589
Priority number, dateUS201261682392P13.08.2012         Original published format: US 201261682392 P
[2015/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014027300
Date:20.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2882747
Date:17.06.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2014
[2015/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2882747
Date:27.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.02.2014
ClassificationInternational:C07D471/04, A61K31/5025, A61P11/00, A61P29/00, A61P35/00, A61P37/00
[2015/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/25]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:BICYCLISCHE HETEROARYLCYCLOALKYLDIAMINDERIVATE ALS INHIBITOREN DER MILZ-TYROSINKINASEN (SYK)[2015/25]
English:BICYCLIC HETEROARYL CYCLOALKYLDIAMINE DERIVATIVES AS INHIBITORS OF SPLEEN TYROSINE KINASES (SYK)[2015/25]
French:DÉRIVÉS HÉTÉROARYLE CYCLOALKYLDIAMINE BICYCLIQUES EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE TYROSINE KINASES DE LA RATE (SYK)[2015/25]
Entry into regional phase13.03.2015National basic fee paid 
13.03.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
13.03.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/25]
17.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.12.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.03.2016Fee for grant paid
10.03.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.03.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.12.2015
Opposition(s)30.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.08.2013
AL27.04.2016
AT27.04.2016
BG27.04.2016
CY27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IS27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
MK27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
IE12.08.2016
LU12.08.2016
PT29.08.2016
MT31.08.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/38]HU12.08.2013
AT27.04.2016
BG27.04.2016
CY27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IS27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
MK27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
IE12.08.2016
LU12.08.2016
PT29.08.2016
MT31.08.2016
Former [2018/32]HU12.08.2013
AT27.04.2016
CY27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IS27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
MK27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
IE12.08.2016
LU12.08.2016
PT29.08.2016
MT31.08.2016
Former [2018/30]HU12.08.2013
AT27.04.2016
CY27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IS27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
MK27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
IE12.08.2016
LU12.08.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/37]AT27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
IE12.08.2016
LU12.08.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/23]AT27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/11]AT27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/10]AT27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/09]AT27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/07]AT27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2016/52]AT27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2016/51]AT27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2016/50]AT27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
Former [2016/49]FI27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
Former [2016/46]LT27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2011014795  (IRM LLC [US]; CHE JIANWEI [US]; DING QIANG [US]; HE XIAOHUI [US]; LIU) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2011014515  (IRM LLC [US]; CHE JIANWEI [US]; CHEN BEI [US]; DING QIANG [US]; HAO XU) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2012097479  (ABBOTT LAB [US]; VASUDEVAN ANIL [US]; PENNING THOMAS DALE [US]; CHEN H) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2012097682  (ABBOTT LAB [US]; ABBOTT LAB TRADING SHANGHAI COMPANY LTD [CN]; VASUDEV) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2006112666  (SK CHEMICALS CO LTD [KR]; KIM HYUNG OOK [KR]; RYU JE HO [KR]; JUNG JAE) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2011053861  (GENOSCO [US]; OSCOTEC INC [KR]; KIM HONG WOO [US]; KOH JONG SUNG [KR];) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2009097287  (IRM LLC [US]; OKRAM BARUN [US]; UNO TETSUO [US]; DING QIANG [US]; LIU) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2007107469  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]; GOLDSTEIN DAVID MICHAEL [US]; RUETH MATTHIAS [) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *
by applicantWO2004078163
 WO9917804
 US4100274
 US4636505
    - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PRINTING COMPANY, (1990), pages 1289 - 1329